Vasquez v. Hazelett, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00012-ROS
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frank Andrew Vasquez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Barcelo, Defendant
No Logo BILL WILLIAMS, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Agra, Defendant
No Logo John/Jane Does, Defendant
No Logo Arpaio, Joseph M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph M. Arpaio"
No Logo LaPoint, Defendant
No Logo Linda Velasquez, Defendant
No Logo Maricopa County Supervisors, Board of, Defendant
No Logo Matcher, Defendant
No Logo Olson, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Spencer, Defendant
No Logo Scott Hazelett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by County of Maricopa, Arizona

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael G Sullivan +1 602 506 7739 +1 602 506 8567 sullivan@mcao.maricopa.gov
No Logo Tademy, Defendant
No Logo Tracy Haggard, Defendant
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Maricopa
Terminated 11/4/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PPS, R&R
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Mail Returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frank Andrew Vasquez. Reason for return: Released unclaimed. No forwarding information is available. Document number 19, 20. (RDS)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Clerks Judgment
    JUDGMENT IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's action be dismissed. (TLJ, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [10] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's action be dismissed.. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/31/05. (TLJ, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Mail Returned
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frank Andrew Vasquez. Reason for return: Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. Document number 16. (RDS)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Mail Returned
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frank AndrewVasquez. Reason for return: Not deliverable as addressed. No forwarding information is available. Document number 15. (RDS)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005, Terminated: 11/4/2005 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [6] Amended Complaint filed by Frank Andrew Vasquez [1] Complaint.. Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/6/05. (TLJ, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Copy Mailed
              Copy of document number 16, mailed to Frank Vasquez on this date. (EAT, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Copy Mailed
                Copy of document number 15, mailed to Frank Vasquez on this date. (EAT, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge. Motions No Longer Referred: [10] MOTION to Dismiss Case.. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/5/05. (TLJ, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Mail Returned
                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frank Andrew Vasquez. Reason for return: Not deliverable as addressed. Research failed to reveal a forwarding address. Document number 13. (RDS)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2005, Pla shall either show cause why his action should not be dismissed w/o prejudice for failure to comply with Court orders pursuant to FedRCivP 41(b) or notify the Court in writing of his current address. Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/29/05. (LSP)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Copy Mailed
                        Copy of document number 13, mailed to Frank Vasquez on this date. (EAT, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Mail Returned
                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frank Andrew Vasquez.. Document number 11. research conducted no other address found (ESH, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                            IT IS ORDERED directing the parties to comply with the attached Briefing Schedule with respect to Defendant Hazelett's Motion to Dismiss (doc. #10). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson on August 5, 2005.) (LOA;vlg)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Copy Mailed
                              Copy of document number 11, mailed to Frank Andrew Vasquez on this date. (vlg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005, Terminated: 11/4/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                MOTION to Dismiss Case (for failure to prosecute) by Scott Hazelett. (LAD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                  ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Stephen E Silverman for Scott Hazelett and attorney Michael G Sullivan will continue to represent the dft (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Other Notice
                                    RESPONSE to NOTICE of pla's appearance (pla received response for not sending a copy of the first amended complaint pursuant to Rule 5) by pla Frank Andrew Vasquez (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for dft Scott Hazelett by Stephen E Silverman, Michael G Sullivan (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Amended Complaint
                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla Frank Andrew Vasquez ; [1-1] ;adding dft Joseph M Arpaio, Bill Williams, Tracy Haggard, Linda Velasquez, Olson, Tademy, Barcelo, Catherine Agra, Maricopa Cty Supv Bd, Matcher, LaPoint, Ruth Spencer, John/Jane Does (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                          WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Scott Hazelett ; waiver sent on 8/13/03 (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                                            USM 285, summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to dft Scott Hazelett . (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Remark re Service Packets Received
                                              Service Packets received on 07/31/03 from pla as to dft Scott Hazelett (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                                                USM 285, summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to dft Scott Hazelett . (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Remark re Service Packets Received
                                                  Service Packets received on 07/14/03 from pla as to dft Scott Hazelett (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Remark re Service Packets Received
                                                    Service Packets received on 07/01/03 from pla as to dft Scott Hazelett (former emp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE by Judge Roslyn O. Silver: the Maricopa County Sheriff shall collect $150 file fee from pla's trust account by collecting monthly payments; Clerk of the Court is directed to serve by mail a copy of this order on Maricopa County Sheriff's Office Inmate Legal Services; Clerk of the Court is directed toserve by mailing a copy of this order on Richard Stewart, Maricopa County Attorney's Office; Clerk of the Court to forward a copy of this order to Financial Administration for the Phoenix Division of the U.S. District Court (cc: all counsel/RStewart/MCAtty/Fin) re: order filed [4-1] (former emp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver : permission to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; pla is obligated to pay the $150 filing fee; dft Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and pla's verbal abuse claim are dismissed from this action; Clerk of the Court shall send pla a service packet for dft Hazelett; copies of summons, complaint and order to be served at Gov expense upon dfts; Pla shall complete and return the service packets to the Clk of Court w/in 20 days of the file date of this Order. Service packet due back by 1/29/03 FURTHER ORDERED dfts shall answer or otherwise respond by appropriate motion w/in the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) Fed. R. Civ. P. Case referred to Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson (cc: All Cnsl/pla with forms) (former emp) Modified on 01/09/2003
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Roslyn O. Silver and is referred to Lawrence O. Anderson (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                            PRISONER Civil Rights Complaint filed. (ESH)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?