Knaubert v. Current Director
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00013-SMM--JRI
District Judge Stephen M. McNamee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Knaubert, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Current Director, Defendant
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Pinal
Terminated 8/5/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003, Terminated: 2/9/2004 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: re: order filed [34-2] to dismiss case having failed to comply with this Court's Order, Plaintiff shall take nothing and this complaint and action are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, SMM, JI, judgment drawer) (TLJ)
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee denying as moot the motion for extension of time so Court can hopefully understand what I am saying by pla Michael Knaubert [27-1]; the Court sua sponte grants pla an additional 30 days in which to file his amended complaint in compliance with the Court's orders of 1/16/03 and 2/18/03; the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice if pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days; spec. prisoner ddl set for 6/6/03 ; striking reply [29-1]; striking motion to readdress 2nd extension of time to reply to Court order of 1/12/03 and opology re court order of 2/12/03 with by pla Michael Knaubert [30-1]; striking motion on never received a grant of denial on 2nd extension of time or knows if judge could read my writing or understand what I write because wrong meds by pla Michael Knaubert [31-1]; striking motion to inform of surgery (what to do about change of address and time limits if unable to write) by pla Michael Knaubert [33-1]; until the Court screens pla's still-to-be- filed amended complaint and finds that it states a claim, pla is prohibited from filing any motion in this matter except a single motion for extension of time which must demonstate good cause for such extension (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION to inform of surgery (what to do about change of address and time limits if unable to write) by pla Michael Knaubert [33-1] (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION to correct mailing date on motion date 4/1/03 (should be 4/3/03) by pla Michael Knaubert [32-1] (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Motion for Ruling
          MOTION on never received a grant of denial on 2nd extension of time or knows if judge could read my writing or understand what I write because wrong meds by pla Michael Knaubert [31-1] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION to readdress 2nd extension of time to reply to Court order of 1/12/03 and opology re court order of 2/12/03 with questions by pla Michael Knaubert [30-1] (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by pla Michael Knaubert to order dated 1/12/03 for 2nd extension of time [15-1] (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE by pla Michael Knaubert of change of address: 34045, ASP-Eyman SMU 1, PO Box B-4000, Florence, AZ 85232 (cc: atty maint) (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 5/6/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                  NEW MOTION for extension of time so Court can hopefully understand what I am saying by pla Michael Knaubert [27-1] (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee striking motion for copy of Rule 2 Arbitration from Federal Civil Procedure 2002 for Arizona (rules dealing with arbitration) by pla Michael Knaubert [16-1] striking motion to read all motions in the following order as it is important by pla Michael Knaubert [17-1] striking motion for Clerk of the Court to supply the prison litigation Reform Act 42 USC Subsection 1997 E(A) by pla Michael Knaubert [19-1] striking motion for physical and mental examination as to Rule 35 by pla Michael Knaubert [21-1] striking motion for postage re-addressed (need of funds for postage) by pla Michael Knaubert [22-1] striking motion for photocopies re-addressed (credit with ADOC for photocopying) by pla Michael Knaubert [23-1] striking motion to grant use of typewriter by court order by pla Michael Knaubert [24-1] striking motion to take into consideration of facts before reading everthing filed on 1/28/03 by pla Michael Knaubert [25-1]; denying motion to dismiss the Hon. Judge Stephen M McNamee by pla Michael Knaubert [20-1]; granting motion for extension of time (to pay fees, complaint...) by pla Michael Knaubert [18-1]; pla shall file an amended complaint no later than 30 days from the date this Order is entered; the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice if pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days; spec. prisoner ddl set for 3/20/03 ; until the Court screens pla's still-to- be-filed amended complaint and finds that it states a claim, pla is prohibited from filing any motion in this matter except a 2nd motion for extension of time, which must demonstrate good cause for such extension (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 2/18/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION to take into consideration of facts before reading everthing filed on 1/28/03 by pla Michael Knaubert [25-1] (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee denying as moot the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ifp) by pla Michael Knaubert [8-1]; denying motion for clarification of dfts and other items by pla Michael Knaubert [9-1]; denying motion to explain what is going on with paperwork by pla Michael Knaubert [13-1]; denying motion for Removal of Attorney Michael Brodsky as he is representing the D.O.C. in this action by pla Michael Knaubert [12-1]; denying motion for Removal of Magistrate Judge Irwin from Case by pla Michael Knaubert [10-1]; denying motion for Order to Correct and The Right Heading (Michael Knaubert v.Acting Director ? Charles Ryan, et al., Incoming Director ?) by pla Michael Knaubert [11-1]; denying motion for Order to Delay All Judgment till more motions filed by pla Michael Knaubert [14-1]; until the Court screens pla's still-to- be filed amended complaint and finds that it states a claim, pla is prohibited from filing any motion in this matter, except a motion for extension of time (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION to grant use of typewriter by court order by pla Michael Knaubert [24-1] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION for photocopies re-addressed (credit with ADOC for photocopying) by pla Michael Knaubert [23-1] (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MOTION for postage re-addressed (need of funds for postage) by pla Michael Knaubert [22-1] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION for physical and mental examination as to Rule 35 by pla Michael Knaubert [21-1] (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                  MOTION to dismiss the Hon. Judge Stephen M McNamee by pla Michael Knaubert [20-1] (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    MOTION for Clerk of the Court to supply the prison litigation Reform Act 42 USC Subsection 1997 E(A) by pla Michael Knaubert [19-1] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      MOTION for extension of time (to pay fees, amended complaint...) by pla Michael Knaubert [18-1] (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MOTION to read all motions in the following order as it is important by pla Michael Knaubert [17-1] (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 2/18/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION for copy of Rule 2 Arbitration from Federal Civil Procedure 2002 for Arizona (rules dealing with arbitration) by pla Michael Knaubert [16-1] (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            MOTION for Order to Delay All Judgment till more motions filed by pla Michael Knaubert [14-1] (KMG)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION to explain what is going on with paperwork by pla Michael Knaubert [13-1] (KMG)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION for Removal of Attorney Michael Brodsky as he is representing the D.O.C. in this action by pla Michael Knaubert [12-1] (KMG)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  MOTION for Order to Correct and Add The Right Heading (Michael Knaubert v.Acting Director ? Charles Ryan, et al., Incoming Director ?) by pla Michael Knaubert [11-1] (KMG)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                    MOTION for Removal of Magistrate Judge Irwin from Case by pla Michael Knaubert [10-1] (KMG)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Michael Knaubert [3-1]; dismissing the complaint (pris civil rights) [1-1] with leave to amend; pla shall have 30 days to amend his complaint; the Clerk of Court is directed to enter dismissal of this action, without prejudice, if pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days; spec. prisoner ddl set for 2/17/03 ; denying as moot the motion to allow to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Michael Knaubert [4-1]; denying motion to credit my postage by pla Michael Knaubert [5-1]; the Clerk of Court is directed to provide to pla a current court-approved form for filing a complaint pursuant to 42 USC section 1983 (cc: all counsel) (complaint form sent to pla with copy of this order) (LAD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE by Judge Stephen M. McNamee (cc: all counsel/Director, ADOC/Brodsky/Finance) re: order filed [6-1] (LAD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          MOTION for clarification of dfts and other items by pla Michael Knaubert [9-1] (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                            MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis (ifp) by pla Michael Knaubert [8-1] (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              MOTION to credit my postage by pla Michael Knaubert [5-1] (TLJ)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                MOTION to allow to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Michael Knaubert [4-1] (TLJ)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003, Terminated: 1/16/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                  MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Michael Knaubert [3-1] (TLJ)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Stephen M. McNamee and is referred to Jay R. Irwin (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                      PRISONER Civil Rights Complaint filed. (ESH)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 211 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?