Dudley v. Venneman, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00014-SMM-LOA
District Judge Stephen M. McNamee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Damien Lakieth Dudley, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bradner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
No Logo CO II #10520, Defendant
No Logo F Schultz, Defendant
No Logo Ferguson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
No Logo Gutierrez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
No Logo Klingberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
No Logo Soulvie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
No Logo Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Stewart"
No Logo Terry Stewart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
No Logo Venneman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Morrow +1 602 542 7692 +1 602 542 3393 James.Morrow@azag.gov
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Maricopa
Terminated 2/4/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004, Terminated: 2/9/2004 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered granting dfts' motion to dismiss and pla's case is dismissed. (cc: all counsel, jgm drawer) re: judgment [35-1] (DMT)
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to dismiss case as moot pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez, dft Venneman [23-1] and pla's case is dismissed; finding the motion for default judgment against Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by pla [25-1] (originally docketed 5/29/03) moot., finding the motion for entry of default as to Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by pla [27-1] moot., finding the motion to extend time to file responsive pleadings by dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez [29-1] moot. (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee withdrawing the reference to the Mag Judge as to motion to dismiss case as moot pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez, dft Venneman [23-1] only; before Judge Stephen M. McNamee, withdrawing the reference to the Mag Judge as to motion to extend time to file responsive pleadings by dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez [29-1] only; before Judge Stephen M. McNamee. All other matters in this action remain with the Magistrate Judge for disposition as appropriate (cc: all counsel, LOA) (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by dfts to response to motion to dismiss case as moot pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, Bradner, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez, dft Venneman [23-1] (DMT)
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE by pla Damien Lakieth Dudley to motion to dismiss case as moot pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez, dft Venneman [23-1] (DMT)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee withdrawing the reference to the Mag Judge as to motion for entry of default as to Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by pla [27-1] only; before Judge Stephen M. McNamee, withdrawing the reference to the Mag Judge as to motion for entry of default judgment against Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by dft Stewart, dft Terry Stewart, dft F Schultz, dft Gutierrez, dft Ferguson, dft Bradner, dft Klingberg, dft Venneman, dft Soulvie [25-1] only; before Judge Stephen M. McNamee. All other matters remain with Magistrate Judge for disposition as appropriate (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
              CROSS-MOTION to extend time to file responsive pleadings by dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez [29-1] and RESPONSE to motion for entry of default judgment against Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by dft Stewart, dft Terry Stewart, dft F Schultz, dft Gutierrez, dft Ferguson, dft Bradner, dft Klingberg, dft Venneman, dft Soulvie [25-1] [25-1] by dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez (DMT)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of pla in support of motion for entry of default as to Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by pla [27-1] by pla Damien Lakieth Dudley (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Motion for Entry of Default
                  MOTION for entry of default as to Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by pla [27-1] (DMT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of plaintiff in support of motion for entry of default judgment against Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by dft Stewart, dft Terry Stewart, dft F Schultz, dft Gutierrez, dft Ferguson, dft Bradner, dft Klingberg, dft Venneman, dft Soulvie [25-1] [25-1] by pla (DMT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                      MOTION for default judgment against Stewart, Terry Stewart, F Schultz, Gutierrez, Ferguson, Bradner, Klingberg, Venneman, Soulvie by pla [25-1] (originally docketed 5/29/03) (DMT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson: pla shall have until 6/23/03 to respond to dft's motion to dismiss; dfts shall have until 7/9/03 to file a reply (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [24-1] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to dismiss case as moot pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez, dft Venneman [23-1] (former emp) Modified on 06/05/2003
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson denying motion for court to order AZ Department of Corrections to reveal the name of Badge Number 10520 by pla Damien Lakieth Dudley [13-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                              WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Soulvie ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Venneman ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                  WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Klingberg ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                    WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Bradner ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                      WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Ferguson ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                        WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Gutierrez ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                          WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft F Schultz ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                            WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Stewart ; waiver signed on 4/18/03 (SAT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION for court to order AZ Department of Corrections to reveal the name of Badge Number 10520 by pla Damien Lakieth Dudley [13-1] (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Terry Stewart on 4/2/03 in Phoenix, AZ (CMM)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - summons, complaint attempted upon dft CO II #10520 (DMT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson denying without prejudice the motion for in camera review of Terry Stewart's present address by pla [8-1] (to provide present address in camera for service), denying as moot motion for United States Marshal to provide service of process by pla [7-1] (with copy of AZ Department of Corrections Order Manual attached as exhibit A), denying as moot motion for United States Marshal to provide service of process by pla [6-1], denying as moot motion for United States Marshal to provide service of process by pla [5-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                                                      USM 285, summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft CO II #10520, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez . (former emp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Remark re Service Packets Received
                                                        Service Packets received on 03/19/03 from pla as to dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft CO II #10520, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez (former emp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                          NOTICE by pla of change of address - AZ State Prison-Florence, PO Box 8600, Florence, AZ 85232 (CMM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/19/2003 Motion to Produce
                                                            MOTION for in camera review of Terry Stewart's present address by pla [8-1] (to provide present address in camera for service) (CMM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              MOTION for United States Marshal to provide service of process by pla [7-1] (with copy of AZ Department of Corrections Order Manual attached as exhibit A) (CMM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION for United States Marshal to provide service of process by pla [6-1] (CMM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  MOTION for United States Marshal to provide service of process by pla [5-1] (CMM)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Remark re Service Packets Received
                                                                    Service Packets received on 03/06/03 from pla as to dft Venneman, dft Klingberg, dft Ferguson, dft Soulvie, dft Terry Stewart, dft Bradner, dft F Schultz, dft CO II #10520, dft Stewart, dft Gutierrez (Civil Intake)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee : permission to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; pla obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $150.00 and is assessed initial partial filing fee of $6.56; copies of summons, complaint and order to be served at Gov expense upon dfts Venneman, Klingberg, Ferguson, Soulvie, Terry Stewart, Bradner, Shultz, CO #10520, Deputy Warden Stewart, Gutierrez; Pla shall complete and return the service packets to the Clk of Court w/in 20 days of the file date of this Order. Service packet due back by 2/12/03 FURTHER ORDERED dfts shall answer or otherwise respond by appropriate motion w/in the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) Fed. R. Civ. P. Folowing dfts are dismissed from action without prejudice terminating party Luna, party Cooper, party Inmate Banking, party Ulabari, party McVickers, party Kimble , Case referred to Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson (cc: All Cnsl, LOA) (DMT) Modified on 01/23/2003
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee for payment of inmate filing fee (cc: all counsel, Director of AZ Department of Correctins, M Brodsky, Finance) re: order filed [3-1] (DMT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Stephen M. McNamee and is referred to Lawrence O. Anderson (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                            PRISONER Civil Rights Complaint filed. (ESH)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?