Ramsdell v. Erskine Bowles
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 95-1148

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2019 at 7:12 PM ST (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Bowles, Erskine B. Bowles, Erskine B., Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Erskine Bowles Erskine Bowles, Et. Al.,"
Officer/Director, Cousins Properties Inc.
General Motors Corporation Officer/Director, General Motors Corporation
Officer/Director, Krispy Kreme Doughnuts Inc
Officer/Director, Norfolk Southern Corp
Officer/Director, Belk, Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judy A.S. Metcalf +1 207 729 1144 +1 207 729 1140
Space Stephen G. Morrell +1 207 780 3564
Space John A. Woodcock +1 207 942 9900 +1 207 942 6999
No Logo Yvonne Ramsdell, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RALPH A. DYER radyer@maine.rr.com
Nature of Suit 2190 - Contract: Other Contract Action
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.med.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=94-00095&caseId=94-00095
Lower Court Case https://ecf.med.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=94-00095&caseId=94-00095
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None ?
Archives location information. Transfer Number: 276-98-0012. Box Number: 8/43 file.
The Court of Appeals record is held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. Copies of the record can be ordered online at http://www.archives.gov/northeast/boston/public/court-records.html. [95-1148] (BS)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None ?
    Archives location information for the briefs and appendices (if any) only. Transfer Number: 276-98-0010. Box Number: 10/80.
    The Court of Appeals record is held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. Copies of the record can be ordered online at http://www.archives.gov/northeast/boston/public/court-records.html. [95-1148] (BS)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: None ?
      U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER denying petition for writ of certiorari , filed in the Supreme Court on 2/20/96. (SU)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: None ?
        U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE filed regarding petition for writ of certiorari. Filed in the Supreme Court on 11/29/95. Supreme Court case number: 95-842. (SU)
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None ?
          RECORD returned, Including box in exhibit room. (SU)
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None ?
            MANDATE ISSUED. (SU)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: None ?
              Opinion can be found in Federal Reporter 64 F. 3d 5 (SU)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: None ?
                BILL OF COST filed by Stephen G. Morrell for Appellees Erskine Bowles. Certificate of service date 9/7/95 [95-1148] (SU)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: None ?
                  JUDGMENT: Terminated on the Merits after Oral Hearing; Affirmed; Written, Signed, Published. William W. Schwarzer, Authoring Judge; Judge Michael Boudin; Judge Levin H. Campbell. (DB)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: None ?
                    CASE ARGUED 06/05/95. Boudin, Campbell, Schwarzer, JJ. (SU)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: None ?
                      Assigned for hearing at the June, 1995 session. (SU)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: None ?
                        APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Yvonne Ramsdell. Pages: 25. Copies: 25. Delivered by mail. Certificate of service date 4/26/95. (TW)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: None ?
                          ORDER: by Judge Bruce M. Selya. Upon consideration of motion leave is granted the appellant to file a reply brief consisting of thirty (30) pages exclusive of any table of contents, table of citations or any addendum thereto. (TW)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: None ?
                            MOTION filed for Appellant Yvonne Ramsdell to file reply brief in excess of 25 pages. (TW)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: None ?
                              ORDER: by Judge Bruce M. Selya. Upon motion, it is ordered that J. Peter Crane, Personal Representative of the Estate of Clyde R. Crane be substituted for the defendant Clyde R. Crane in this case. (DB)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: None ?
                                MOTION filed for Appellant Yvonne Ramsdell requesting party information changed on docket. (DB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: None ?
                                  BRIEF filed by Stephen G. Morrell for Appellees. Copies: 10. Certificate of service date 4/13/95. (SU)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: None ?
                                    Involvement of attorney Mark S. O'Brien for Erskine Bowles terminated. (SU)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None ?
                                      APPELLANT'S BRIEF and APPENDIX filed on behalf of Yvonne Ramsdell. Pages: 42, Copies: 10, delivered by mail, filed. Certificate of service date 3/15/95. (DB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 2/22/1995, Entered: None ?
                                        APPELLANT'S STATEMENT of issues and DESIGNATION of the contents of the appendix to the brief filed by Ralph A. Dyer by leave of court. (SU)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: None ?
                                          APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ralph A. Dyer on behalf of Appellant Yvonne Ramsdell. (SU)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: None ?
                                            APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Judy A.S. Metcalf, Stephen G. Morrell on behalf of Appellees Erskine Bowles. (SU)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: None ?
                                              ATTORNEY Judy A.S. Metcalf for Appellees Erskine Bowles added to case(s) [95-1148]. (SU)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: None ?
                                                RECORD ON APPEAL filed: One Box in exhibit room volume(s). Appellant's Brief Due 3/15/95. (SU)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: None ?
                                                  CIVIL case docketed. [162533-1] Notice filed by Ralph A. Dyer for Appellant Yvonne Ramsdell. Record on appeal due 2/21/95. (SU)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?