Al-Mudarisi v. INS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02547-PGR--MS
District Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ali Al-Mudarisi, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo John Ashcroft, Respondent
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 12/22/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Pinal
Terminated 3/2/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Mail Returned
RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Ali Al-Mudarisi re judgment [4-2] (research conducted no other address available) (ESH)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT: re: order filed [3-2] to dismiss case having failed to comply with this Court's Order, Petitioner shall take nothing and this petition and action are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, PGR, MS, judgment drawer) (TLJ)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that the Petition is dismissed with leave to amend. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed to amend his Petition to name both United States Attorney General John Ashcroft and the Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security Tom Ridge as the respondents; FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner, if Petitioner fails to comply with this Order ; spec. prisoner ddl set for 2/13/04 ; FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide to Petitioner the current court-approved form for filing a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (cc: all counsel/form) (SAT)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 Filing Fee Received
        Filing Fee Paid $ 5.00 by petitioner Ali Al-Mudarisi ; receipt placed on left side of file (SAT)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt and is referred to Morton Sitver (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (TLJ)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
            PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (TLJ)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 76 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?