Fallow, et al v. Herbalife Intl Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02612-SRB
District Judge Susan R Bolton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clint S Fallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip R Wooten PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK J. GIUNTA +1 602 307 0837 +1 602 307 0838 mark.giunta@azbar.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Warnicke & Littler PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 356 0400 +1 602 256 0345 administrator@warnickelittler.com
No Logo Daniel S Fallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK J. GIUNTA +1 602 307 0837 +1 602 307 0838 mark.giunta@azbar.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Warnicke & Littler PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 356 0400 +1 602 256 0345 administrator@warnickelittler.com
No Logo Mary Lynn Fallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK J. GIUNTA +1 602 307 0837 +1 602 307 0838 mark.giunta@azbar.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Warnicke & Littler PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 356 0400 +1 602 256 0345 administrator@warnickelittler.com
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 jhoxie@swlaw.com
Space Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 mlimon-wynn@swlaw.com
v.
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 jhoxie@swlaw.com
Space Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 mlimon-wynn@swlaw.com
No Logo Jay Riley, Defendant
No Logo Tonni Riley, Defendant
No Logo Clint S Fallow, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK J. GIUNTA +1 602 307 0837 +1 602 307 0838 mark.giunta@azbar.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Warnicke & Littler PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 356 0400 +1 602 256 0345 administrator@warnickelittler.com
No Logo Daniel S Fallow, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK J. GIUNTA +1 602 307 0837 +1 602 307 0838 mark.giunta@azbar.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Warnicke & Littler PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 356 0400 +1 602 256 0345 administrator@warnickelittler.com
No Logo Mary Lynn Fallow, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK J. GIUNTA +1 602 307 0837 +1 602 307 0838 mark.giunta@azbar.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Warnicke & Littler PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 356 0400 +1 602 256 0345 administrator@warnickelittler.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 12/30/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $400000
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1452 R&R re motions to remand (non-core)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/22/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV96-03558[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED, TRANSFER
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Filing Fee Received
RECEIPT of acknowledgement of case transfer from District of Idaho (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Case Transferred Out to Another District
    ORIGINAL file, certified copies of transfer order and docket sheet, and transmittal letter mailed to District of Idaho (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to transfer case to US District Court for the District of Idaho by dft Herbalife Intl Inc [2-1] Case transferred to Dist of: Idaho (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004, Terminated: 3/22/2004 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case
        MOTION to transfer case to US District Court for the District of Idaho by dft Herbalife Intl Inc [2-1] (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 1/2/2004 Counterclaim
          COUNTERCLAIM by dft Herbalife Intl Inc against pla Clint S Fallow, pla Mary Lynn Fallow, pla Daniel S Fallow (ESH)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 1/2/2004, Terminated: 4/16/2004 Notice of Removal
            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court Case Number: CV96-03558 (amended complaint) (ESH)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 405 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?