Kidd, Patricia v. DC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 98-7075

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2016 at 3:29 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206700735 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1240571] denying motion to reopen case [1239155-2] in 98-7075, denying motion to reopen case [1240138-2] in 98-7100, enjoining appellant from further filings in this case. The Clerk is directed to accept no further submissions from Patricia Kidd Patricia Kidd in this case. Before Judges: Ginsburg, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [98-7075, 98-7100]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206700620 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION filed [1240511] by Judith W. Rogers, Marion S. Barry, Jr., DC, Bruce A. Marshall and Daniel G. Jarcho in 98-7100, Judith W. Rogers, Patricia Kidd, Eugene Adams, Marion S. Barry, Jr., Lorraine Britton, Barry Campbell, Warren Cruise, DC, Timothy Edwards, Lorraine Greene, Marty Grossman, Ric Murphy, John Adolphus Payton, William Reddick and Daniel G. Jarcho in 98-7075 to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/03/2010) [Service Date: 04/19/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [98-7100, 98-7075] (McKay, James)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206688261 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SUPPLEMENT to record [1240308] filed by Patricia Kidd in 98-7075 [Service Date: 04/12/2010 ] [98-7075, 98-7100] (Lister, Mary)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206684077 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION (styled "appellant's emergency motion for leave to file premature petition for rehearing and hearing en banc - nunc pro tunc as timely or in the alternative, for an extension of time until _________ to file for filing for rehearing, assignment of errors, and reopening . . .") filed [1240138] by Patricia Kidd to reopen case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/29/2010) [Service Date: 04/15/2010 by clerk] Pages: 1-10. [98-7100] (Lister, Mary)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 01206680878 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1239752] to combined with a MOTION FILED by Judith W. Rogers, Eugene Adams, Marion S. Barry, Jr., Lorraine Britton, Barry Campbell, Warren Cruise, DC, Timothy Edwards, Lorraine Greene, Marty Grossman, Ric Murphy, John Adolphus Payton, William Reddick and Daniel G. Jarcho to consolidate cases [Service Date: 04/14/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [98-7075] (McKay, James)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206666670 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION filed [1239155] by Patricia Kidd to reopen case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/22/2010) [Service Date: 04/07/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [98-7075]
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 109 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?