USA, et al v. Medina-Camarena
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-01004-JRI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2), Illegal Re-entry
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Manuel Medina-Camarena (signed 1/2/03) re: detention [4-1] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Order
    MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Manuel Medina-Camarena moved to Crim Case No: CR-03-68-PHX-ROS , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (CMM)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 1/22/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler/Spanish. Deendant Manuel Medina-Camarena prsent with counsel Gregory Torok; preliminray hearing held, probable cause found and defendant held to answer; defendant rejects plea offer and case is transferred to Phoenix. Appointment of counsel hearing set for 1/24/03 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anderson [3-1] re: [3-1] (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        ( FILED: 1/22/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler SPANISH for Manuel Medina-Camarena. , first appearance of Manuel Medina-Camarena ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Manuel Medina-Camarena appears with counsel Gregory Torok; appointment of counsel hearing held, defendant sworn and counsel ordered appointed; detention hearing submtted and defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk; preliminary hearing set for 1/16/03 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Irwin [2-4] (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Complaint
          COMPLAINT filed as to Manuel Medina-Camarena (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/22/2003 Arrest
            DEFENDANT Manuel Medina-Camarena arrested. (1) count(s) cmp (former emp)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 43 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?