USA, et al v. Orosco-Gallardo
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-01005-JRI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326 illegal re-entry after removal from the United States
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Antonio Orosco-Gallardo moved to Crim Case No: CR 03-182 PHX-MHM , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    ( FILED: 2/14/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver . Defendant Antonio Orosco-Gallardo present with counsel Jeffrey Williams; appointment of counsel hearing held and counsel ordered appointed . adding for Antonio Orosco-Gallardo attorney Jeffrey Allen Williams [10-2] (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
      ORDER of detention pending trial, signed 1/2/03 by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Antonio Orosco-Gallardo re: detention [9-1] (PHR)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin granting motion to extend time to indict filed by and as to defendant Orosco-Gallardo [5-1] excludable delay XT started (PHR)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 2/13/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler - SPANISH; defendant Orosco-Gallardo is present with counsel; defendant rejects the plea offer; case is transferred to the District Court in Phoenix, AZ; Appointment of counsel hearing is set for 2/14/03 at 11AM before Mag Judge Sitver. [7-1] re: [7-1] (PHR)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            ( FILED: 2/13/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler - SPANISH. Retained attorney Joseph Bacho make oral motion to get removed from this case per defendant's request; re-appointing counsel for Antonio Orosco-Gallardo , adding Gregory Torok [6-3] (PHR) Modified on 02/26/2003
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/13/2003 Motion to Extend Time
              MOTION to extend time to indict filed by and as to defendant Orosco-Gallardo [5-1] (PHR)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                ( FILED: 2/13/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler - SPANISH. : Waiver of preliminary examination as to Antonio Orosco-Gallardo . Dft held to district court; status hearing re plea is set for 1/31/03 at 9:30 a.m.. [4-2] (PHR)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                  NOTICE of Appearance of attorney for Antonio Orosco-Gallardo : Joseph M Bacho appears and terminating attorney Gregory Thomas Torok for Antonio Orosco-Gallardo (PHR)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    ( FILED: 2/13/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler/SPANISH. first appearance of Antonio Orosco-Gallardo ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Antonio Orosco-Gallardo appears with counsel Gregory Thomas Torok , Bond set to SPANISH Interpreter required for Antonio Orosco-Gallardo; detention hearing submitted and defendant detained; prelim hearing is set for 1/16/03 at 1:30 p.m. [2-4] (PHR) Modified on 02/13/2003
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT filed as to Antonio Orosco-Gallardo (PHR)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 2/13/2003 Arrest
                        DEFENDANT Antonio Orosco-Gallardo arrested. Antonio Orosco-Gallardo (1) count(s) cmp (PHR)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 48 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?