USA, et al v. Reyes-Ramirez
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-01006-JRI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326(a), enchanced by (b)(2) Illegal re-entry
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez re: detention [3-1] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Order
    MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez moved to Crim Case No: CR 03-82 PHX-JAT , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 1/23/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler. first appearance of Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez appears with counsel Gregory Thomas Torok , SPANISH interpreter for Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez. The defendant was sworn as to his financial status. Detention hearing submitted, defendant continued detained pending trial. Preliminary hearing set for 1/16/03 at 1:30 PM before Mag Judge Irwin. [2-4] (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Complaint
        COMPLAINT filed as to Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/23/2003 Arrest
          DEFENDANT Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez arrested. Alfonso Reyes-Ramirez (1) count(s) cmp (former emp)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 42 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?