Tennessee v. Lane
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 02-1667

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tennessee, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. +1 615 741 3226
No Logo George Lane and Beverly Jones, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by William J. Brown & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. +1 423 476 4515 wjb@vollaw.com
No Logo George Lane, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Alabama, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Schaerr +1 202 282 5845 +1 202 282 5100 gschaerr@winston.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis W. Archer +1 312 988 5215
No Logo Blanche Fischer Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gianelli & Morris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherril Nell Babcock +1 213 620 7272
No Logo Dick Thornburgh, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arlene Brynne Mayerson +1 510 644 2555 +1 510 841 8645 AMayerson@dredf.org
No Logo Kansas and Delaware, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph James DeZago +1 785 368 8428
No Logo Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles T. Lester, Jr. +8597 859 838 4294 +1 859 486 6590 cteljr@yahoo.com
No Logo Minnesota, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mike Hatch +1 651 296 6196
No Logo Paralyzed Veterans of America, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Keith Armstrong +1 202 783 0800
No Logo Richard Stevens, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacobson Holman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Stevens +1 508 945 0259
No Logo Training and Advocacy Support Center of Natl. Assn. of Protection and Advocacy Systems, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Townsend Rich +1 202 346 4249 +1 202 346 4444 jrich@goodwinprocter.com
Related Case 02A714
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 98-6730
Lower Court Decision Date 1/10/2003
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (06/21/04) of the judgment from the Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.D.C. Middle District of Tennessee.
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
          Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Stevens, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which O'Connor, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Souter, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Ginsburg, J., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Souter and Breyer, JJ., joined. Rehnquist, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kennedy and Thomas, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., and Thomas, J., filed dissenting opinions.
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Michael E. Moore, Solicitor General, Nashville, Tenn. For respondents Lane and Jones: William J. Brown, Cleveland, Tenn. For respondent United States: Paul D. Clement, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioner Tennessee filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                Motion for divided argument filed by Alabama, et al. DENIED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                  Motion for divided argument filed by respondent GRANTED.
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                    Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Middle Dist. of Tennessee (1envelope)
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                      Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Richard Stevens DENIED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 33 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                        Motion for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed by Alabama, et al.
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None
                          Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the Sixth Circuit.
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Blanche Fischer Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                              Motion for divided argument filed by respondent the Solicitor General.
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                Lodging proposal by counsel for petitioner.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                      Brief of respondents George Lane and Beverly Jones filed.( Distributed).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Minnesota, et al. filed. (Distributed).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Kansas and Delaware filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Dick Thornburgh, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                              Appendix to brief of the United States filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Richard Stevens. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Training and Advocacy Support Center of Natl. Assn. of Protection and Advocacy Systems filed. (Distributed).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Paralyzed Veterans of America, et al. filed.(Distributed).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                        CIRCULATED.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                          SET FOR ARGUMENT Tuesday, January 13, 2004.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of the respondents received from counsel for the respondents.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                              Extension of time within which to file government's brief on the merits to and including November 12, 2003.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Letter of petitioner proposing a lodging.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including November 11, 2003.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint appendix filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief of petitioner Tennessee filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including September 8, 2003.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Petition GRANTED Limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 19, 2003.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief of respondents George Lane and Beverly Jones filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief of respondent United States filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2003)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Application (02A714) granted by Justice Stevens extending the time to file until May 12, 2003.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        Application (02A714) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 10, 2003 to May 12, 2003, submitted to Justice Stevens.
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 418 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?