Nelson v. Campbell, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-6821

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo David L. Nelson, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com
No Logo Campbell, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Alabama Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Clayton Crenshaw +1 334 242 7423 +1 334 353 3637 ccrenshaw@ago.state.al.us
No Logo Donal Campbell, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Alabama Office of AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Boysie Billingsley +1 334 242 7401

Toggle Switch Represented by Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin C. Newsom +1 334 242 7401
No Logo Alabama Physicians, Laurie Dill, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Louise Lippert +661111 205 426 3705
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Laurie Dill, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Haywood Kendall +1 212 872 9834 +1 212 872 9815 gkendall@ssd.com
No Logo Ohio and 29 Other States, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Ohio Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas R. Cole +1 614 466 8980
No Logo Orin Hatch and Tom DeLay, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edgar R Haden +1 205 251 8100 +1 205 488 5648 ehaden@balch.com
Related Case 03A308
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-15095-P
Lower Court Decision Date 10/8/2003
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Middle District of Alabama.
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (06/29/04) of judgment from the Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. O'Connor, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
            LREF
            Blank 31 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Bryan Stevenson, Montgomery, Ala. For respondents: Kevin C. Newsom, Solicitor General, Montgomery, Ala.
              LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioner David L. Nelson filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                Brief amici curiae of Ohio and 29 Other States filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of Orrin Hatch and Tom DeLay filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                    Brief of respondents Donal Campbell, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                      Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                        Record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None
                          Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Middle District of Alabama. (1 envelope)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                            CIRCULATED.
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: None
                              Extension of time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits to and including March 3, 2004.
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
                                Brief of petitioner David L. Nelson filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Laurie Dill, et al. filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT Monday, March 29, 2004.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                      Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED. Michael K. McIntyre, Esquire, of Atlanta, Georgia is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: None
                                        Joint appendix filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                                          Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including January 22, 2004.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                                            Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2004.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: None
                                              Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to the following Question: Whether a complaint brought under 42 U. S. C. Sec. 1983 by a death-sentenced state prisoner, who seeks to stay his execution in order to pursue a challenge to the procedures for carrying out the execution, is properly recharacterized as a habeas corpus petition under 28 U. S. C. Sec. 2254.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Alabama Physicians, Laurie Dill, et al. GRANTED.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 26, 2003.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                      Supplemental brief of petitioner David L. Nelson filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Alabama Physicians, Laurie Dill, et al.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                          Supplemental brief of respondents Donal Campbell, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 14, 2003.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                              Reply of petitioner David L. Nelson filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Application (03A308) granted by the Court.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Application (03A308) referred to the Court by Justice Kennedy.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief of respondents Campbell, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      Application (03A308) for a stay of execution, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 10, 2003)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?