Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense v. Padilla
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-1027

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Jose Padilla and Donna R. Newman, as Next Friend of Jose Padilla, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna R. +1 212 229 1516 donnanewman@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrew G. Patel, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew G. Patel +1 212 349 0230 +1 212 346 4665 AGPATEL@AOL.COM
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Shapiro +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2651
No Logo Association of the Bar of the City of New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Gerard Davis +1 212 728 8000
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CATO Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E. Lynch +1 202 842 0200
No Logo Center for National Security Studies, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Payton +1 212 965 2200 jpayton@naacpldf.org
No Logo Comparative Law Scholars and Experts on the Law of the United Kingdom and Israel, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by David N. Rosen & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Rosen +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 drosen@davidrosenlaw.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Francis Donovan +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 dfdonovan@debevoise.com
No Logo Fred Korematsu. et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arturo Jorge Gonzalez +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 agonzalez@mofo.com
No Logo Global Rights, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Franklin Fitzpatrick +1 202 942 5878 +1 202 942 5560
No Logo International Law Professors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Wythe Fdtn. Professor of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda A. Malone +1 757 221 3844
No Logo Janet Reno, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Litt +1 202 942 5398 +9425 942 942 5999 robert.litt@aporter.com
No Logo John Cornyn and Larry E. Craig, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Senate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Cornyn +1 202 224 7840
No Logo Law of War Experts, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David John Scheffer +1 312 503 2224 d-scheffer@law.northwestern.edu
No Logo Law Professors Susan Akram, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Boston College Legal Assistance Bureau

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Kanstroom +1 617 552 0880 +1 617 552 4098 kanstroo@bc.edu
No Logo Law Professors with a Particular Interest in Habeas Corpus Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons, Del Deo, Dolan, Giffinger & Vecchione, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan L. Hafetz +1 212 649 4743
No Logo Legal and Religious Organizations, Beverly Hills Bar Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bridget Arimond +1 312 503 8579 b-arimond@law.northwestern.edu
No Logo National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenna, Brenna & Boyce, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald G. Rehkopf +1 585 454 2000 drehkopfjr@brennalaw.com
No Logo Original Congressional Sponsors of 18 U.S.C. 4001(A), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Stuart Koukoutchos +1 504 626 4409
No Logo Others Are Us and Jonathan D. Wallace, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan D. Wallace +1 917 359 6234
No Logo Practitioners and Specialists in the International Law of War, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Vanderbuilt University Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison Marston Danner +1 615 322 6762
No Logo Professors of Constitutional Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jules Lobel , +1 412 648 1375 jll4@pitt.edu
No Logo Public Defender Service For The District Of Columbia, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Patrick O'Toole +1 202 824 2523 +1 202 824 2351 TOtoole@milchev.com
No Logo Shirley Hufstedler, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. LoBue +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 rplobue@pbwt.com
No Logo Spartacist League and Partisan Defense Committee, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rachel H Wolkenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel H. Wolkenstein +1 212 406 4252
No Logo The Rutherford Institute et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo Virginia, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Hurd +1 804 697 1200 william.hurd@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-2235, 03-2438
Lower Court Decision Date 12/18/2003
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (08/06/04) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 53 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. (U.S.D.C. record included)
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
        Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Rehnquist, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which O'Connor, Scalia, Kennedy, and Thomas, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which O'Connor, J., joined. Stevens, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined.
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Jennifer Martinez, Stanford, Cal.
            LREF
            Blank 49 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None
            Reply of petitioner Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None
              Sealed affidavit of Joe Ennis lodged with permission of the Clerk. (Distributed).
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
                Motion for divided argument filed by respondent DENIED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 46 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: None
                  Motion for divided argument filed by respondent.
                    LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                    Letter of respondent proposing a lodging.
                      LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Spartacist League and Partisan Defense Committee filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 43 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                        Brief amicus curiae of Public Defender Service for the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of Law of War Experts filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Association of the Bar of the City of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 40 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Center for National Security Studies and the Constitution Project filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 39 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of Global Rights filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Comparative Law Scholars and Experts on the Law of the United Kingdom and Israel filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondents Jose Padilla and Donna R. Newman, as Next Friend of Jose Padilla filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Louis Henkin, Harold Hongju Koh, and Michael H. Posner filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of The Rutherford Institute et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Janet Reno, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/10/2004, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Fred Korematsu. et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 4/10/2004, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Law Professors Susan Akram, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Original Congressional Sponsors of 18 U.S.C. 4001(A) filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of Others Are Us and Jonathan D. Wallace filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of Practitioners and Specialists in the International Law of War filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of Law Professors with a Particular Interest in Habeas Corpus Law filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of Legal and Religious Organizations, Beverly Hills Bar Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Shirley Hufstedler, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Professors of Constitutional Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of International Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      CIRCULATED.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amici curiae of John Cornyn and Larry E. Craig filed. VIDED.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Virginia filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief of petitioner Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint appendix filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit and U.S.D.C., Southern District of New York. (2 boxes)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT WEDNESDAY, APRIL 28, 2004.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                          .
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Petition GRANTED. The brief of petitioner is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 3 p.m., Wednesday, March 17,
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Supplemental brief of respondent Jose Padilla and Donna R. Newman, as Next Friend of Jose Padilla filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                Reply of petitioner Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief of respondent Jose Padilla and Donna R. Newman, as Next Friend of Jose Padilla in opposition filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2004.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner GRANTED. A response to the petition for a writ of certiorari is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon the Solicitor General on or before 3 p.m., Wednesday, February 4, 2004
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2004.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2004)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?