Rasul v. Bush, President of the United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-334

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fawzi Khalid Abdullah Fahad Al Odah, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Wilner +1 202 508 8050 +1 202 508 8100 twilner@shearman.com
No Logo Shafiq Rasul, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Margulies +1 312 503 0890 j-margulies@law.northwestern.edu
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "George W. Bush, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
No Logo 175 Members of Both Houses of Parliament of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Coudert Brothers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Matthews +1 212 626 4400
No Logo Abdullah Al-Joaid, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Patricia Michel +1 202 496 7339
No Logo Alabam, Ohio, Texas, and Virginia, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Park, Jr. +1 678 347 2208 +1 678 347 2210 jjp@sbllaw.net
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
No Logo Bill Owens, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hale Westfall, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Westfall +1 720 904 6010 +1 720 904 6020 rwestfall@halewestfall.com
No Logo Bipartisan Coalition of National and International Non-Government Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Marc Freiman +1 203 498 4584 +1 203 782 2889 jfreiman@wiggin.com
No Logo Center for Justice and Accountability, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas W. Van Aelstyn +1 415 772 6566 +1 415 772 6268 Nicholas.vanAelstyn@hellerehrman.com
No Logo Citizens for the Common Defense, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo Commonwealth Lawyers Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Shea & Gardner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Pollak +1 202 828 2000
No Logo Diego C. Asencio, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Hannay +1 312 258 5617 +1 312 258 5600 whannay@schiffhardin.com
No Logo Former American Prisoners of War, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas F. Cullen , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas F. Cullen, Jr. +1 202 879 3939
No Logo Former Attorneys General of the United States, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew G. McBride +1 202 719 7135 +1 202 719 7049 amcbride@wileyrein.com
No Logo Former U.S. Government Officials, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Hongju Koh +1 203 432 4932 harold.koh@yale.edu
No Logo Fred Korematsu, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Schulhofer +1 212 998 6260 stephen.schulhofer@nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Strauss +1 773 702 4907 d-strauss@uchicago.edu
No Logo Human Rights Institute of International Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Overy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Rogers Chepiga +1 212 610 6300 +1 212 610 6399 pamela.chepiga@allenovery.com
No Logo Hungarian Jews and Bougainvilleans, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com
No Logo International Commission of Jurists, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by William J. Butler Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Butler +1 212 725 5505
No Logo International Law and Jurisdiction Professors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by STANFORD LAW SCHOOL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Barton +1 650 723 2691
No Logo International Law Expert Curtis F.J. Doebbler, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Klimaski & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. +1 202 296 5600
No Logo Law Professors Kenneth Anderson, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Rivkin +1 202 861 1731 +1 202 861 1783 drivkin@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Legal Historians Listed, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by St. Thomas More Professor of Law & Legal History

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Oldham +1 202 662 9090
No Logo Nathaniel R.Jones, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Bradford +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 527 0484 djbradford@jenner.com
No Logo National Institute of Military Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowan Liebowitz & Latman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald William Meister +1 212 790 9255 +1 212 575 0671 RWM@CLL.COM
No Logo Omar Ahmed Khadr, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Michigan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. E. +1 734 647 3736 pottow@umich.edu
No Logo Retired Military Officers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C. Schroeder +1 312 701 7964 jschroeder@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Related Case 04A41
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-5251/5284/5288
Lower Court Decision Date 3/11/2003
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 60 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for District of Columbia Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 59 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (07/19/04) of judgment from the Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 58 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 57 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
          Application (04A41) granted by Justice Stevens for immediate transmission of opinion and certified copy of judgment to the Clerk of the USCA DC Circuit.
            LREF
            Blank 56 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
            Application (04A41) for immediate transmission of opinion and certified copy of judgment to the Clerk of the USCA DC Circuit, submitted to Justice Stevens.
              LREF
              Blank 55 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
              Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Stevens, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which O'Connor, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and Thomas, J., joined.
                LREF
                Blank 54 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                Argued. For petitioners: John J. Gibbons, Newark, N.J. For respondents: Theodore B. Olson, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
                  LREF
                  Blank 53 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None
                  Letter from counsel for petitioners Rasul and Iqbal, dated 4/15/04 received. (Distributed).
                    LREF
                    Blank 52 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.D.C. District of Columbia. (2 folders)
                      LREF
                      Blank 51 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None
                      Reply of petitioners Shafiq Rasul, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 50 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                        Record received from U.S.C.A. Dist. of Columbia Circuit. (1 box)
                          LREF
                          Blank 49 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Alabama, Ohio, Texas, and Virginia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 48 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Bill Owens, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 47 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Kenneth Anderson, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  Mar 3 2004
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Citizens for the Common Defense
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 42 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                          Brief of respondents George W. Bush, et al. filed. (Distributed) VIDED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                            CIRCULATED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 39 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                              SET FOR ARGUMENT TUESDAY, APRIL 20, 2004.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 38 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Hungarian Jews and Bougainvilleans GRANTED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including March 3, 2004.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Fred Korematsu filed. VIDED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Retired Military Officers filed. VIDED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Hungarian Jews and Bougainvilleans. VIDED.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Brief of petitioners Fawzi Khalid Abdullah Fahad Al Odah, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Brief of petitioners Shafiq Rasul, et al. filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Joint appendix filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Center for Justice and Accountability, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of 175 Members of Both Houses of Parliament of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland filed. VIDED.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights Institute of International Bar Association filed. VIDED.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Military Justice filed. VIDED.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Diego C. Asencio, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Former U.S. Government Officials filed. VIDED.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Legal Historians Listed filed. VIDED.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Coalition of National and International Non-Government Organizations filed. VIDED.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Nathaniel R.Jones, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Abdullah Al-Joaid filed. VIDED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth Lawyers Association filed. VIDED.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Former American Prisoners of War filed. VIDED.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of International Law Experts Curtis F.J. Doebbler, John Mitchell, and Christine Chinkin filed. VIDED.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Omar Ahmed Khadr filed. VIDED.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of International Commission of Jurists, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of International Law and Jurisdiction Professors filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including January 14, 2004.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Petition GRANTED limited to the following Question: Whether United States courts lack jurisdiction to consider challenges to the legality of the detention of foreign nationals captured abroad in connection with hostilities and incarcerated at the Guantanamo Bay Naval Base, Cuba. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 7, 2003.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2003.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Retired Military Officers filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of International Law Expert Curtis F.J. Doebbler filed.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Fred Korematsu filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights Institute of International Bar Association filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Former American Prisoners of War filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth Lawyers Association filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Diego C. Asencio, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of John J. Gibbons, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief of respondents George W. Bush, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2003)
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?