Hamdi v. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-6696

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yaser E. Hamdi and Esam Fouad Hamdi, as next friend of Yaser Esam Hamdi, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank W. Dunham, Jr. +1 804 343 0800 +1 703 525 2489
No Logo Donald Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis W. Archer +1 312 988 5215
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Shapiro +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2651
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CATO Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E. Lynch +1 202 842 0200
No Logo Center for American Unity, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinberg, Jacobs & Tolani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barnaby W. Zall +1 301 231 6943 +1 301 984 1200 bzall@bzall.com
No Logo Charles B. Gittings, Jr., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenna, Brenna & Boyce, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald G. Rehkopf +1 585 454 2000 drehkopfjr@brennalaw.com
No Logo Claremont Institute Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Eastman +1 714 628 2587 +1 714 844 4817 jeastman@chapman.edu
No Logo Common Defence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Howard Charnes +1 336 607 7382 +1 336 734 2602 acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Karen B Tripp Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Bryant Tripp +1 713 658 9323 +1 713 658 9410 ktripp@tripplaw.com
No Logo Experts on the Law of War, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Hongju Koh +1 203 432 4932 harold.koh@yale.edu
No Logo Former Prisoners of War, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Allen +1 212 506 2500
No Logo Fred Korematsu, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Strauss +1 773 702 4907 d-strauss@uchicago.edu
No Logo Global Rights, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Franklin Fitzpatrick +1 202 942 5878 +1 202 942 5560
No Logo International Humanitarian Organizations and Associations of International Journalists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. +1 212 872 1000
No Logo International Law Professors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas W. Baruch +1 202 639 7052 +1 202 639 7003 douglas.baruch@friedfrank.com
No Logo John Cornyn and Larry Craig, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Senate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Cornyn +1 202 224 7840
No Logo John J. Gibbons, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Bradford +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 527 0484 djbradford@jenner.com
No Logo Nathaniel R. Jones, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. LoBue +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 rplobue@pbwt.com
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Thomas DeVinney +1 202 663 8000 william.devinney@pillsburylaw.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-7338
Lower Court Decision Date 1/8/2003
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (08/04/04) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Virginia.
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
        Record returned to U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
          Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. O'Connor, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered an opinion, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and Kennedy and Breyer, JJ., joined. Souter, J., filed an opinion concurring in part, dissenting in part, and concurring in the judgment, in which Ginsburg, J., joined. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioners: Frank W. Dunham, Jr., Federal Public Defender, Alexandria, Va. For respondents: Paul D. Clement, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioners Yaser E. Hamdi and Esam Fouad Hamdi, as next friend of Yaser Esam Hamdi filed. (Distributed).
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                  Brief amicus curiae of Common Defence filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                    Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                      Brief of respondents Donald Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Center for American Unity, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed. (Distributed).
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                              CIRCULATED.
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of John Cornyn and Larry Craig filed. VIDED.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                  Record received from U.S. District Court for Eastern District of Virginia. (1 envelope)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None
                                    Record received from U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit. (1 box)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                      SET FOR ARGUMENT WEDNESDAY, APRIL 28, 2004.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Charles B. Gittings, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                          Brief of petitioner Yaser E. Hamdi and Esam Fouad Hamdi, as next friend of Yaser Esam Hamdi filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Certain Former Prisoners of War filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Nathaniel R. Jones, et al. filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Experts on the Law of War filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Joint appendix filed. (Joint appendix in two volumes).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Global Rights filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of International Law Professors filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of International Humanitarian Organizations and Associations of International Journalists filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Supplemental brief of respondents Donald Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Supplemental brief of petitioners Yaser E. Hamdi and Esam Fouad Hamdi, as next friend of Yaser Esam Hamdi filed. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2004.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Reply of petitioners Yaser E. Hamdi and Esam Fouad Hamdi, as next friend of Yaser Esam Hamdi filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Former Prisoners of War, et al. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Nine copies of Joint Appendix filed in the Court of Appeals received from counsel for respondents.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief of respondents Donald Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 3, 2003.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of John J. Gibbons, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Fred Korematsu filed. VIDED.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 3, 2003)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 252 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?