USA, et al v. Caudillo-Camacho
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-06000-DKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Maricopa
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
18922(g)(5)(a) and 924(a)(2); Unlawful transport of firearms, etc.
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho moved to Crim Case No: CR 03-091-PHX-EHC , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Waiver of Indictment
    WAIVER of Indictment pending by USA as to Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho ; Judge drawn to hear plea: Carroll (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
      ORDER of detention pending trial by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan as to Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho re: detention [6-1] (KSB)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        (FILED: 1/7/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer present. Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho present with appointed counsel, Jane McClellan. Detention Hearing submitted; dft continued detained pending trial based on flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived; dft held to answer before District Court. [5-1] re: [5-1] (KSB)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan appointing Jane McClellan as counsel for Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho. re: [4-1] (KSB)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
            CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho (KSB)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              (FILED: 1/3/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Spanish Interpreter: Cristina Sporrer present. First appearance of Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho; dft informed of rights, etc. Dft, Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho, appears with appointed counsel, Jane L McClellan. Detention and Preliminary Hearings set on 1/6/03 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Duncan. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. [2-4] (KSB)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                COMPLAINT filed as to Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho (KSB)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Arrest
                  DEFENDANT Guillermo Caudillo-Camacho arrested. (KSB)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 51 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?