USA, et al v. Nieblas-Lopez
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-06001-DKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Maricopa
Terminated 3/10/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326(b)(2); Illegal re-entry
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan granting motion by defendant to dismiss for speedy trial violation (no oral argument requested) [6-1] as to Miguel Nieblas-Lopez Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez (1) count(s) cmp. Dismissed on defendant's motion Case closed (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Response to Motion
    RESPONSE by DUTY AUSA Phoenix to motion by defendant to dismiss for speedy trial violation (no oral argument requested) [6-1] as to Miguel Nieblas-Lopez (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION by defendant to dismiss for speedy trial violation (no oral argument requested) [6-1] as to Miguel Nieblas-Lopez (SMM)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
        ORDER of detention pending trial by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan as to Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez re: detention [5-1] (PKD)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer/spanish for dft Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez. Detention submitted, dft detained as flight risk; prelim hrg waived, dft held to answer before District Court. [4-1] re: [4-1] (PKD)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan appointing David Lee Titterington as counsel for Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez. re: [3-1] (KSB)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              (FILED: 1/3/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Spanish Interpreter: Cristina Sporrer present. First appearance of Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez; dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Dft, Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez, appears with appointed counsel, David Lee Titterington. Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Hearings set on 1/7/03 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Duncan. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. [2-4] (KSB)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                COMPLAINT filed as to Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez (KSB)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Arrest
                  DEFENDANT Miguel Angel Nieblas-Lopez arrested. (KSB)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 71 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?