USA, et al v. Acosta
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-06002-DKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Maricopa
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
182113(a); Bank Robbery by Force or Violence
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Andrew Acosta moved to Crim Case No: CR-03-75-PHX-ROS , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (CMM)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    ( FILED: 1/13/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Defendant Andrew Vincent Acosta present with counsel Daphne Budge appearing for Robert Storrs; defendant counse requests a continuance in the detention hearing and preliminary hearing and waives time limits; request is granted and hearings reset to 1/24/03 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anderson. [6-1] re: [6-1] (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
      ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 1/3/03 as to Andrew Acosta (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
        CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Andrew Acosta appointing Robert Storrs (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
          CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Andrew Acosta (SMM)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            (FILED: 1/9/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. RECORDED: CS. Dft Andrew Acosta appears with counsel Daphne Budge for Robert Storrs. Appointment of counsel hearing held. Robert Storrs appointed. Dft Andrew Acosta temporarily detained. Detention and preliminary hearings set for 1/10/03 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan [cc: usms, pts, cja, dkd] [2-3] (SMM)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Arrest
              DEFENDANT Andrew Acosta arrested. (SMM)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                COMPLAINT Andrew Acosta (1) count(s) cmp (KSB)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Warrant Issued
                  ARREST WARRANT issued for Andrew Acosta; ordered by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan (KSB)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 39 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?