USA, et al v. Bojorquez-Ruiz
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-06003-DKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Pinal
Terminated 1/7/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
18922(g)(5)(A); Unlawful transport of firearms, etc.
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan granting motion to dismiss all counts charged [6-1] by USA as Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz (1) count(s) cmp. Dismissed without prejudice Defendant dismissed from case Case closed (PKD)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003, Terminated: 1/7/2003 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to dismiss all counts charged [6-1] by USA as Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz (PKD)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Interpreter: Cristina Sporrer/spanish for dft Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz. Government files Motion to Dismiss in Court. Motion GRANTED. The dft is release from U.S. Marshal custody. [5-1] re: [5-1] (PKD)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan appointing Milagros Cisneros as counsel for Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz. re: [4-1] (KSB)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
          CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz (KSB)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            (FILED: 1/3/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Spanish Interpreter: Louis Velasco present. First appearance of Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz; dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Dft, Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz, appears with appointed counsel, Milagros Anais Cisneros. Detention and Preliminary Hearings set on 1/7/03 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Duncan. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. [2-4] (KSB)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
              COMPLAINT filed as to Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz (KSB)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Arrest
                DEFENDANT Heriberto Bojorquez-Ruiz arrested. (KSB)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 61 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?