USA, et al v. Jack
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-mj-06004-DKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Guadalupe Delia Jack, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Lee Titterington +1 602 382 2700 +1 602 382 2800 Lee_Titterington@fd.org
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Other Notice
NOTICE re appearance of Assistant U.S. Attorney Darcy Cerow (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan appointing David Lee Titterington (nunc pro tunc to date of initial appearance) as counsel for defendant Guadalupe Delia Jack. re: [8-1] (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Other Notice
      NOTICE OF DELIVERANCE OF PASSPORT as to dft Guadalupe Delia Jack. Passport surrendered 1/3/03. (SMM)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Waiver of Rule 40 Hearings
        Rule 40 identity hearing waived as to Guadalupe Delia Jack (SMM)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 BondCourt Filing
          APPEARANCE BOND unsecured in the amount of $20,000 as to Guadalupe Delia Jack; ordered by Magistrate Judge David Duncan (SMM)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan setting conditions of release. Bond set to $20,000 unsecured for Guadalupe Delia Jack. (SMM)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              (FILED: 1/10/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. RECORDED ON: CS. Detention hearing submitted as to Guadalupe Delia Jack, dft released on $20,000 unsecured bond. Identity hearing waived. Defendant to appear in the Southern District of New York before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 1/27/03 at 9:00 am [cc: usm, pts, cnsl, dkd] [3-1] re: [3-1] (SMM)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Guadalupe Delia Jack (SMM)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  (FILED: 1/10/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. RECORDED: CS. Government's motion to unseal is GRANTED. Initial appearance held; dft Guadalupe Delia Jack advised of charges, rights, etc. Assistant Federal Public Defender David Lee Titterington appeared for dft Guadalupe Delia Jack. Appointment of counsel hearing held. David Lee Titterington appointed. Detention hearing set for 1/3/03 at 3:30 pm, dft temporarily detained; identity hearing set for 1/8/03 at 2:00 pm before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan [cc: usm, pts, dkd] [1-3] (SMM)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Arrest - (Warrant issued other district)
                    DEFENDANT Guadalupe Delia Jack arrested on warrant on an indictment, 02CRIM.1585, from the Southern District of New York (SMM)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 119 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?