Gen-Probe Inc. v. Vysis, Inc
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-9629

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Derrick Rivers, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Leeza Cherniak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leeza Rhee Cherniak +1 404 355 3031
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-11734
Lower Court Decision Date 1/12/2004
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (05/23/05) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None
      Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Johnson v. United States, 544 U.S. _____ (2005).
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None
        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2005.
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None
          Motion to consolidate case with No. 03-9685 DENIED.
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
            Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 15, 2004.
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
              Motion to consolidate case with No. 03-9685, Johnson v. United States filed by petitioner.
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None
                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None
                  Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                    Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 2, 2004.
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. VIDED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None
                        Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 2, 2004.
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None
                          Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 3, 2004)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 32 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?