Deluca v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 02-1672

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Roderick Jackson, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia D. 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 310 553 6700 +1 202 383 5414 wdellinger@omm.com
No Logo Birmingham Board of Education, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie L. Acoff +1 205 328 7915 +1 205 424 0670 valerieacoff@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Means Gillis & Seay PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth L Thomas +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 klthomas@tmgslaw.com
No Logo *College Sports Council National Wrestling Coaches Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Joseph +1 202 669 5135 +1 202 318 2254 ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
No Logo Alabama, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin C. Newsom +1 334 242 7401
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Birch Bayh, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Cooney +1 202 344 4812 +1 202 344 8300 jfcooney@venable.com
No Logo Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Andrew L. Schlafly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Layton Schlafly +1 908 719 8608 +1 212 214 0354 aschlafly@aol.com
No Logo Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia A. Seitz +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Michigan Pork Porducers Association, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity QB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward M Mansfield +1 515 243 7100 +2431 243 243 1408 emmansfield@belinlaw.com
No Logo Natioinal School Boards Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National School Boards Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Underwood +1 703 838 6722
No Logo National Education Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah A. Collins +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 jcollins@bredhoff.com
No Logo National Partnership for Women & Families, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline Montrose Brown +1 202 662 5219 +1 202 778 5219 cbrown@cov.com
No Logo New York Lawyers for the Public Interest, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington, D.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Lamken +1 202 639 7978 +1 202 639 7890 jlamken@mololamken.com
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Findley +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jhf@pacificlegal.org
No Logo Roderick Jackson v. Birmingham Board of Education, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving L. Gornstein +1 202 514 2201
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Women's Sports Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Coastal School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Hogshead-Makar +1 904 680 7784
Related Case 02A829
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-11303
Lower Court Decision Date 10/21/2002
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. - Northern District of Alabama.
    LREF
    Blank 49 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. - 11th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 48 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (05/02/05) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 47 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 46 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED O'Connor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and Scalia and Kennedy, JJ., joined.
            LREF
            Blank 45 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
            Motion to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by respondent DENIED.
              LREF
              Blank 44 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
              Motion to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by respondent Birmingham Board of Education. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 43 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                Argued. For petitioner: Walter Dellinger, Washington, D.C.; and on behalf of the United States, as amicus curiae, Irving L. Gornstein, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Kenneth L. Thomas, Birmingham, Ala; and Kevin C. Newson, Solicitor General, Montgomery, Ala. (for Alabama, as amicus curiae.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 42 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                  Record received from U.S.D.C. N. Dist. of Alabama. (1 folder)
                    LREF
                    Blank 41 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                    Reply of petitioner Roderick Jackson filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                      Record received from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                        LREF
                        Blank 39 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                        Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                          Motion of Alabama, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. The time is divided as follows: 20 minutes to the respondent and 10 minutes to Alabama, et al.
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                            Letter dated October 26, 2004 received from counsel for the respondent. (Distributed).
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
                              Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                Motion of Alabama, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                  Brief of respondent Birmingham Board of Education filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of National Wrestling Coaches Association filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                              CIRCULATED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 30, 2004.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including October 7, 2004.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of National Partnership for Women & Families, et al. filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Women's Sports Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of New York Lawyers for the Public Interest, et al. filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Birch Bayh filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil Rights filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of College Sports Council filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief of petitioner Roderick Jackson filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint appendix filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the respondent
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including August 19, 2004.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 10, 2004.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2003.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          Reply of petitioner Roderick Jackson filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief of respondent Birmingham Board of Education in opposition filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 16, 2003.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2003)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Application (02A829) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 13, 2003.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Application (02A829) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 13, 2003 to June 12, 2003, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?