Tsolainos v. Louisiana
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-473

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Gil Garcetti, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Franscell Strickland Roberts & Lawrence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Lee +1 818 545 1925 +1 818 545 1937
No Logo Richard Ceballos, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Humberto Guizar +1 323 725 1151 +1 323 725 0350 herito@aol.com
Space Bonnie I. Robin-Vergeer +1 202 588 1000
No Logo American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by AFL - CIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Bryan Coppess +1 202 637 5337 +1 202 637 5323 jcoppess@aflcio.org
No Logo Association of Deputy District Attorneys, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jody Manier Kris +1 202 663 6000
No Logo California State Association of Counties, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burk E. Delventhal +1 415 554 4650
No Logo Elaine Mittleman, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elaine J. Mittleman +1 703 734 0482 +1 703 734 0482 elainemittleman@msn.com
No Logo Gil Garcetti, et al. v. Richard Ceballos, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Kneedler +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Government Accountability Project, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joanne Royce +1 202 408 0034
No Logo International Municipal Lawyers Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Schaerr +1 202 282 5845 +1 202 282 5100 gschaerr@winston.com
No Logo National Association of Counties, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Ruda +1 202 365 1363 rmruda@hotmail.com
No Logo National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Craig Small +1 310 229 1001 +1 310 229 1001 msmall@akingump.com
No Logo National Education Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah A. Collins +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 jcollins@bredhoff.com
No Logo National School Boards Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National School Boards Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naomi Gittins +1 703 838 6722
No Logo National Treasury Employees Union, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory O'Duden +1 202 572 5500
No Logo Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Thos. Jefferson Cntr for Free

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joshua Wheeler +1 434 295 4784
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-55418
Lower Court Decision Date 3/22/2004
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Central District of California.
    LREF
    Blank 45 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 44 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (07/05/06) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 43 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 42 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined. Stevens, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Souter, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens and Ginsburg, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
            LREF
            Blank 41 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
            Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of tme filed by Elaine Mittleman DENIED.
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None
              Reargued. Cindy S. Lee, Glendale, Cal.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for the United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Bonnie I. Robin-Vergeer, Washington, D.C.
                LREF
                Blank 39 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                Motion for leave to file amicus brief in support of neither party out of time filed by Elaine Mittleman. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
                  SET FOR REARGUMENT on March 21, 2006.
                    LREF
                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                    This case is RESTORED to the calendar for reargument.
                      LREF
                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                      Argued. For petitioners: Cindy S. Lee, Glendale, Cal.; and Dan Himmelfarb, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for the United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Bonnie I. Robin-Vergeer, Washington, D.C.
                        LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
                        Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                          Reply of petitioners Gil Garcetti, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                            Record received from U.S.D.C. for Central Dist. of California. (1 box)
                              LREF
                              Blank 32 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                              Record received from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                                LREF
                                Blank 31 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief of respondent Richard Ceballos filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Government Accountability Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of National Education Association filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Association of Deputy District Attorneys, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 12, 2005.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                    CIRCULATED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including July 22, 2005.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Brief of petitioners Gil Garcetti, et al. filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Joint appendix filed. (Jt. Appendix in three volumes.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of National School Boards Association filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Further extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits to and including May 27, 2005.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits to and including May 9, 2005.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Petition GRANTED.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by California State Association of Counties GRANTED.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 25, 2005.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              Reply of petitioners Gil Garcetti, et al. filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief of respondent Richard Ceballos in opposition filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 26, 2005.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Response Requested . (Due December 27, 2004)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 3, 2004.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by California State Association of Counties.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Waiver of right of respondent Richard Ceballos to respond filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2004)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?