Roper, Superintendent, Potosi Correctional Center v. Simmons
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-633

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald P. Roper, Superintendent, Potosi Correctional Center, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Layton +1 573 751 3321

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Hawke +1 573 751 3321 +1 573 751 3825 stephen.hawke@ago.mo.gov
No Logo Christopher Simmons, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas E. Moseley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Herndon +3 134 831 5531 +1 314 831 5645 jenifer@ix.netcom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
No Logo European Union and Members of the International Community, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by PROFESSOR OF LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. +1 202 274 4147
No Logo Justice for All Alliance, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAN CUTRER +1 214 273 0311
No Logo Juveniile Law Center, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Juvenile Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha L. Levick +1 215 625 0551 mlevick@jlc.org
No Logo Alabama, Delaware, Oklahoma, Texas, Utah, and Virginia, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin C. Newsom +1 334 242 7401
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis W. Archer +1 312 988 5215
No Logo American Medical Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Thomas McLaughlin +1 212 832 8300 +1 212 763 7600 jmclaughlin@hewm.com
No Logo American Psychological Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew S. Days +1 202 887 1500 DDays@mofo.com
No Logo Coalition for Juvenile Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Davies Tydings +1 202 828 2231 +1 202 887 0689
No Logo Constitution Project, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurie Webb Daniel +1 404 817 8500 laurie.daniel@hklaw.com
No Logo Former U.S. Diplomats Morton Abramowitz, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Hongju Koh +1 203 432 4932 harold.koh@yale.edu
No Logo Human Rights Committee of the Bar of England and Wales, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constance De la +1 415 422 2296 delavega@usfca.edu
No Logo Missouri Ban Youth Executions (Bye) Coalition, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph W. Luby +1 816 363 2795
No Logo Murder Victims' Families for Reconciliation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Murder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kate Lowenstein 1 +1 +1 +1
No Logo NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christina A Swarns +1 212 965 2267 +1 212 219 2052 cswarns@naacpldf.org
No Logo National Legal Aid and Defender Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Vermont Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Mello +1 802 831 1291
No Logo New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin Joan Halligan +1 212 416 8069
No Logo President James Earl Carter, Jr., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwestern University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas F. +1 312 503 8576
No Logo United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Other Religious Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark E. Chopko +1 202 541 3300
Related Case 04A125
Lower Court Supreme Court of Missouri
Lower Court Case No(s). SC84454
Lower Court Decision Date 8/26/2003
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
Record returned to Supreme Court of Missouri.
    LREF
    Blank 49 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
    Acknowledgement of receipt (04/07/05) of mandate from Clerk, Supreme Court of Missouri received.
      LREF
      Blank 48 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
      MANDATE ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 47 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
        Adjudged to be AFFIRMED Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Stevens, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Ginsburg, J., joined. O'Connor, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and Thomas, J., joined. (Detached Opinion)
          LREF
          Blank 46 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
          1 box of additional record material from the Supreme Court of Missouri received.
            LREF
            Blank 45 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: James R. Layton, State Solicitor, Jefferson City, Mo. For Respondent: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 44 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioner Donald P. Roper, Superintendent, Potosi Correctional Center filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 43 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
                Lodging proposal of counsel for respondent.
                  LREF
                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
                  SET FOR ARGUMENT Wednesday, October 13, 2004.
                    LREF
                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                    Record received from Supreme Court of Missouri. (1 box)
                      LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
                      Application (04A125) Extension of time for filing the reply brief on the merits is granted to and including September 7, 2004.
                        LREF
                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
                        Application (04A125) to extend the time to file a reply brief from August 23, 2004 to September 7, 2004, submitted to Justice Thomas.
                          LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                          CIRCULATED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Juveniile Law Center, et al. filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of President James Earl Carter, Jr., et al. filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Diplomats Morton Abramowitz, et al. filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Constitution Project filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                          Brief of respondent Christopher Simmons filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of European Union and Members of the International Community filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of National Legal Aid and Defender Association filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Juvenile Justice filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Committee of the Bar of England and Wales, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Other Religious Organizations filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Missouri Ban Youth Executions (Bye) Coalition filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Murder Victims' Families for Reconciliation filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including July 19, 2004.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent GRANTED. Jennifer Herndon, Esq., of St. Louis, Missouri is appointed to serve as counsel for the respondent in this case.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including July 6, 2004.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 13, 2004.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint appendix filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief of petitioner Donald P. Roper, Superintendent, Potosi Correctional Center filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Justice for All Alliance filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Alabama, Delaware, Oklahoma, Texas, Utah, and Virginia filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 2, 2004.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Christopher Simmons.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including April 20, 2004.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2004.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Reply of petitioner Donald P. Roper, Superintendent, Potosi Correctional Center filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Christopher Simmons.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief of respondent Christopher Simmons in opposition filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 24, 2003.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Appendix of Donald P. Roper, Superintendent, Potosi Correctional Center filed.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2003)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 276 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?