Johnson v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-9685

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Johnson, Jr, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtland L. Reichman +1 404 572 4610 +1 404 572 5145 creichman@kslaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Garland Samuel & Loeb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Franklin Samuel +1 404 262 2225 +1 404 365 5041 dfs@gsllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 01-14830
Lower Court Decision Date 8/5/2003
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Middle District of Georgia.
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (05/09/05) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
          Adjudged to be AFFIRMED Souter, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and O'Connor, Thomas, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens, Scalia, and Ginsburg, JJ., joined.
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
            Record received from the U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of Georgia (1 envelope)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
              Argued. For petitioner: Courtland Reichman, Atlanta, Ga. For respondent: Dan Himmelfarb, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                Record received from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioner Robert Johnson, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                    Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                      CIRCULATED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                        Joint appendix filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                            Brief of petitioner Robert Johnson, Jr. filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                              SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 18, 2005.
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None
                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                      Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 2, 2004.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None
                                          Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 7, 2004.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None
                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 6, 2004)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?