Lingle, Governor of Hawaii v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-163

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Linda Lingle, Governor of Hawaii, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G. +1 202 974 5114

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
Chevron Corporation Chevron Corporation, Respondent
Officially listed as "Chevron U.S.A. Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Ellsworth Stewart +1 415 626 3939 +1 415 875 5700 cestewart@jonesday.com
No Logo Action Apartment Association, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosario Perry +1 310 394 9831 +1 310 394 4294 rosarioperry@mac.com
No Logo American Planning Asociation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Shubert & Barer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward J. Sullivan +1 503 228 3939
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Allen Epstein +1 773 450 4476 repstein@uchicago.edu
No Logo Charles W. Coupe, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Kupchak +5318 531 531 8031
No Logo Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Bradford +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 527 0484 djbradford@jenner.com
No Logo League of California Cities, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Shute Mihaly & Weinberger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew W. Schwartz +1 415 552 7272 schwartz@smwlaw.com
No Logo Manufactured Housing Communities of Arizona, inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Parham +1 602 265 6804
No Logo National Association of Home Builders, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Munroe Berger +1 310 312 4000 +1 310 312 4224 mmberger@manatt.com
No Logo National Conference of State Legislature, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Ruda +1 202 365 1363 rmruda@hotmail.com
No Logo National Conference of State Legislatures, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Community Rights Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy J. Dowling +1 202 296 6889
No Logo New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin Joan Halligan +1 212 416 8069
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. S. Radford +1 916 419 7111 rsr@pacificlegal.org
No Logo Service Station Dealers of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ASTRACHAN GUNST & THOMAS PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter H. Gunst +1 410 783 3542
No Logo Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul F Utrecht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F. Utrecht +1 415 956 8100 paul@zulpc.com
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Related Case 03A1040
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-15867
Lower Court Decision Date 4/1/2004
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Dist. of Hawaii.
    LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. - 9th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (06/27/05) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 47 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. O'Connor, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. Kennedy, J., filed a concurring opinion.
            LREF
            Blank 46 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
            Letter received from counsel for the respondent, pursuant to Rule 29.6, indicating name change to Chevron Corporation. VIDED.
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
              Argued. For petitioners: Mark J. Bennett, Attorney General, Honolulu, Hawaii; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Craig E. Stewart, San Francisco, Cal.
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                Record received from U.S.D.C. District of Hawaii. (2 boxes)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioners Linda Lingle, Governor of Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                      Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                        Brief amicus curiae of Action Apartment Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief of respondent Chevron U.S.A. Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Charles W. Coupe, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
                                      Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including January 14, 2005.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
                                        Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 30 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of Manufactured Housing Communities of Arizona, inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                              CIRCULATED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 28 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 22, 2005.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of League of California Cities filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Planning Association filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of Service Station Dealers of America filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of National Conference of State Legislature, et al. filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Brief of petitioners Linda Lingle, Governor of Hawaii, et al. filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Joint appendix filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioners.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits to and including December 3, 2004.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including December 3, 2004.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Petition GRANTED.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Supplemental brief of respondent Chevron U.S.A. Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Supplemental brief of petitioners filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 8, 2004.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Reply of petitioners Linda Lingle, Governor of Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of League of California Cities filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief of respondent Chevron U.S.A. Inc. in opposition filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Service Station Dealers of America filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support either party recieved from counsel for the respondents.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2004)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Application (03A1040) granted by Justice O'Connor extending the time to file until July 30, 2004.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Application (03A1040) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 30, 2004 to July 30, 2004, submitted to Justice O'Connor.
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 224 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?