Medellin v. Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-5928

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jose Ernesto Medellin, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Francis Donovan +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 dfdonovan@debevoise.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Doug Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gena Blount Bunn +1 512 936 1600 +1 512 320 8132 laura.haney@oag.state.tx.us
Space R. Ted Cruz +1 512 936 1824 Ted.Cruz@aog.state.tx.us
Space Tina J. Miranda +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 tina.miranda@oag.state.tx.us

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael R. Dreeben +1 202 514 2201 michael.r.dreeben@usdoj.gov
No Logo Alabama, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles B. Campbell +1 334 242 7300
No Logo Alliance Defense Fund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas M. Cooley Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Wagner +1 517 371 5140
No Logo Ambassador Bruce Laingen, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Margulies +1 312 503 0890 j-margulies@law.northwestern.edu
No Logo Amnesty International, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Sullivan , +1 202 737 0500 +1 202 626 3737 krsullivan@kslaw.com
No Logo European Union and Members of the International Communtiy, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S Adele Shank +1 614 326 1217 +1 614 326 1028 shanklaw@att.net
No Logo Foreign Sovereigns, Argentina, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Asim M. Bhansali +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 amb@kvn.com
No Logo Former United States Diplomats, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Hongju Koh +1 203 432 4932 harold.koh@yale.edu
No Logo Government of the United Mexican States, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra L. Babcock +1 312 503 0114 +1 312 503 2798 s-babcock@law.northwestern.edu
No Logo International Law Experts, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Fisler Damrosch +1 212 854 3740 damrosch@law.columbia.edu
No Logo John Cornyn, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Jose Ernesto Medellin v. Doug Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Liberty Legal Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Liberty Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly J. Shackelford +1 972 941 4444 +1 972 941 4449 kshackford@libertyinstitute.org
No Logo Mountain States Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Perry Pendley +1 303 292 2021 +1 303 292 1980 wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
No Logo NAFSA: Association of International Educators, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve F. Hanlon +1 202 955 3000
No Logo National District Attorneys' Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles C. Olson +1 404 969 4001
No Logo Professors of International Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul B. Stephan +1 434 924 7098
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Type Capital
Related Case 04A739
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-20687
Lower Court Decision Date 5/20/2004
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Southern Dist. of Texas
    LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. - 5th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 60 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 59 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
        Writ of certiorari DISMISSED as improvidently granted. Opinion Per Curiam. Ginsburg, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Scalia, J., joined as to Part II. O'Connor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens, Souter, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Souter, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion in which Stevens, J., joined.
          LREF
          Blank 58 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None
          Copy of Subsequent Application For Post-Conviction Writ Of Habeas Corpus filed in the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals lodged by counsel for petitioner.
            LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Donald Francis Donovan, New York, N.Y. For respondent: R. Ted Cruz, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.; and Michael R. Dreeben, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
              LREF
              Blank 56 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
              Letter from counsel for the petitioner received. (Distributed).
                LREF
                Blank 55 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioner Jose Ernesto Medellin filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 54 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
                  Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. to be divided as follows: 30 minutes for petitioner; 20 minutes for respondent; and 10 minutes for the United States.
                    LREF
                    Blank 53 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
                    Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2005.
                      LREF
                      Blank 52 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
                      Response of respondent to petitioner's motion to stay filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 51 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                        Letter from the Solicitor General received. (Distributed).
                          LREF
                          Blank 50 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                          Motion to stay further proceedings filed by petitioner.
                            LREF
                            Blank 49 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                            Application (04A758) to file in excess of page limits granted by Justice Scalia. The applicant's reply brief on the merits may not exceed 30 pages.
                              LREF
                              Blank 48 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                              Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 47 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
                                Application (04A758) to file petitioner's reply brief on the merits in excess of page limits, submitted to Justice Scalia.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 46 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 43 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of John Cornyn filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Legal Institute filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 40 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of National District Attorneys Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of Professors of International Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Brief of respondent Doug Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Application (04A739) to file in excess of page limits granted by Justice Scalia. The brief may not exceed 50 pages.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Application (04A739) to file an amicus curiae brief on the merits in excess of page limits, submitted to Justice Scalia.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Record received from U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. (1 volume)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                              CIRCULATED.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                Brief of petitioner Jose Ernesto Medellin filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Foreign Sovereigns, Argentina, et al. filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of International Law Experts, et al. filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint appendix filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Ambassador Bruce Laingen, et al. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of NAFSA : Association of International Educators, et al. filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Bar Associations and Human Rights Organizations filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Former United States Diplomats filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of European Union and Members of the International Communtiy filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 28, 2005.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 10, 2004.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 3, 2004.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2004.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Reply of petitioner Jose Ernesto Medellin filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief of respondent Doug Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. (PRINTED BRIEF)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 27, 2004.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of International Law Experts, et al. filed.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Foreign Sovereigns, Argentina, et al. filed.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of European Union and Members of the International Communtiy filed.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Amnesty International, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Ambassador Bruce Laingen, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 20, 2004.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Appendix of Jose Ernesto Medellin filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 20, 2004)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Opposition of respondent to petitioner's application to exceed the page limitation.
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 239 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?