Rompilla v. Beard
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-5462

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald Rompilla, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Billy H. Nolas +1 215 928 0520 +1 215 928 0826 billy_nolas@fd.org
No Logo Jeffrey A. Beard, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Zapp +1 717 705 4487 azapp@attorneygeneral.gov
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo James Joseph Lynch, Jr. and Friends of Ronald Rompila, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by cwnet.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Joseph +1 916 929 3055 jjlynch@cwnet.com
No Logo National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey J Anderson +1 202 637 5689 +1 202 637 5910 ajanderson@hhlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Type Capital
Related Case 03A932
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 00-9005, 00-9006
Lower Court Decision Date 1/13/2004
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (07/25/05) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Eastern District of Pennsylvnia.
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 3rd Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED. Souter, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, O'Connor, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. O'Connor, J., filed a concurring opinion. Kennedy, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined.
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
            Record received from U.S.D.C.- Pennsylvania. (3 boxes and 1 envelope)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
              Argued. For petitioner: Billy H. Nolas, Assistant Federal Defender, Philadelphia, Penn. For respondent: Amy Zapp, Chief Deputy Attorney General, Harrisburg, Penn.
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioner Ronald Rompilla filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit. (1 box)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                      Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                        Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                            Brief of respondent Jeffrey A. Beard, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                              CIRCULATED.
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                    Brief of petitioner Ronald Rompilla filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                      Lodging to Joint appendix of lower court record material received.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 18 2005.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/7/2004, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of James Joseph Lynch, Jr. and Friends of Ronald Rompila filed. (Distributed) (TO BE RECOVERED).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                            Joint appendix filed. (Joint appendix in six volumes).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                              Application (04A324) denied by Justice Souter.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                Application (04A324) to file petitioner's brief on the merits in excess of page limits, submitted to Justice Souter.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Reply of petitioner Ronald Rompilla filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Brief of respondent Jeffrey A. Beard, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections in opposition filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 26, 2004)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Application (03A932) granted by Justice Souter extending the time to file until July 24, 2004.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Application (03A932) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 25, 2004 to July 24, 2004, submitted to Justice Souter.
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 267 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?