Kelo v. New London
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-108

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Susette Kelo, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Institute for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Bullock +1 703 682 9320 +1 703 682 9321 sbullock@ij.org
No Logo City of New London, Connecticut, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Horton, Shields & Knox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wesley W. Horton +1 860 522 8338 +1 860 728 0401 jdube@hsklawfirm.com
No Logo America's Future Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Andrew L. Schlafly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Layton Schlafly +1 908 719 8608 +1 212 214 0354 aschlafly@aol.com
No Logo American Planning Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Merrill +1 203 436 8990 tmerri@law.columbia.edu
No Logo Becket Fund for Religious Liberty, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by usccb.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony R. Picarello +1 202 541 3300 apicarello@usccb.org
No Logo Better Government Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Levenstam +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 840 7735 blevenstam@jenner.com
No Logo Brooklyn United for Innovative Local Development (BUILD), et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by DONAHUE & GOLDBERG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Thomas Goldberg +1 212 334 8813 david@donahuegoldberg.com
No Logo California Redevelopment Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yang, Iris P +1 916 444 4000
No Logo Cascade Policy Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Huffman +1 503 203 1583
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Allen Epstein +1 773 450 4476 repstein@uchicago.edu
City of New York City of New York, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Cardozo +1 212 788 0866 +1 212 227 5641 mcardozo@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Claremont Institute Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Eastman +1 714 628 2587 +1 714 844 4817 jeastman@chapman.edu
No Logo CONNECTICUT, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by General Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. +1 860 808 5020
No Logo Connecticut Conference of Municipalities, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by City Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allan B. Taylor +1 203 275 0100 +2750 275 275 0343
No Logo Develop Don't Destroy (Brooklyn) and West Harlem Business Group, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman H. Siegel +1 212 532 7586 +1 212 448 0066 siegelnorman@aol.com
No Logo Goldwater Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldwater Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Brnovich +1 602 462 5000
No Logo James M. Buchanan, Gordon Tullock, and Pacific Legal Foundation MERITS Mary Bugryn Dudko, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. +1 916 419 7111 jab@pacificlegal.org
No Logo Jane Jacobs, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Getman +1 516 216 9542
No Logo John Norquist, President of Congress for New Urbanism, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank Schnidman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Schnidman +1 954 599 8715 schnidmanf@earthlink.net
No Logo K. Hovnanian Companies, LLC, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Giordano, Halleran & Ciesla PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. SCHNEIDER +1 732 741 3900
No Logo King Ranch, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Austin Hatchell +1 512 305 4700 mahatchell@locklord.com
No Logo Laura B. Kohr and Leon P. Haller, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOEL R. BURCAT +1 717 257 7506 +1 717 257 7598 jburcat@saul.com
No Logo Law Professors Robert H. Freilich, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Freilich +1 816 561 4414
No Logo Massachusetts Chapter of National Association of Industrial and Office Properties, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Jeffrey Lyman +1 617 570 1000
No Logo Mayor And City Council Of Baltimore,, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph S. Tyler +1 410 659 2700
No Logo National Association for Advancement of Colored People, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M. Freier +1 404 881 4100 freier@bmelaw.com
No Logo National Association of Home Builders, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Association of Home Builders

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Lynn +1 202 266 8200
No Logo National League of Cities, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Ruda +1 202 365 1363 rmruda@hotmail.com
No Logo New London Landmarks, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by New England Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Malamut +1 617 695 3660
No Logo New London R.R. Co., Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. O'Connell
No Logo New York State Urban Development Corporation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan B. Kalib +1 212 732 3200
No Logo Professor David L. Callies, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by William S. Richardson School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Callies +1 808 956 6550
No Logo Property Rights Foundation of America, Inc.,et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H Christopher Bartolomucci +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 cbartolomucci@bancroftpllc.com
No Logo Reason Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Robert Nigel, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Kupchak +5318 531 531 8031
No Logo Rutherford Institute,, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Rutherford Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. +1 434 978 3888 johnw@rutherford.org
No Logo Susette Kelo, et al. v. City of New London, Connecticut, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Perry Pendley +1 303 292 2021 +1 303 292 1980 wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
No Logo The American Farm Bureau Federation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Munroe Berger +1 310 312 4000 +1 310 312 4224 mmberger@manatt.com
No Logo Tidewater Libertarian Party, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Ghent Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Gary Merrill +1 757 623 4200 attymerrill@ghentlaw.us
No Logo Vermont. et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Vermont Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bridget C. Asay +1 802 828 3181 basay@atg.state.vt.us
Lower Court Supreme Court of Connecticut
Lower Court Case No(s). SC 16742
Lower Court Decision Date 3/9/2004
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 74 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
Motion to retax costs filed by respondents DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
    LREF
    Blank 73 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None
    Opposition to respondents' motion to retax costs filed.
      LREF
      Blank 72 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
      Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2005.
        LREF
        Blank 71 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
        Acknowledgement of receipt (08/24/05) of judgment from Clerk, Supreme Court of Connecticut received.
          LREF
          Blank 70 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
          Record returned to Supreme Court of Connecticut.
            LREF
            Blank 69 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
            Motion to retax costs filed by respondents.
              LREF
              Blank 68 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
              MANDATE ISSUED.
                LREF
                Blank 67 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                Rehearing DENIED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 66 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                  DISTRIBUTED.
                    LREF
                    Blank 65 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                    Petition for Rehearing filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 64 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                      Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Stevens, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a concurring opinion. O'Connor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Rehnquist, C. J., and Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined. Thomas, J. filed a dissenting opinion.
                        LREF
                        Blank 63 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                        Argued. For petitioners: Scott G. Bullock, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Wesley W. Horton, Hartford, Conn.
                          LREF
                          Blank 62 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
                          Motion of Connecticut for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 61 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                            Reply of petitioners Susette Kelo, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 60 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
                              Objection of Respondents to motion of Amicus Curiae State of Connecticut for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument
                                LREF
                                Blank 59 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of Vermont. et al. filed. (Distributed).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 58 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                  Petitioners opposition to motion of Connecticut for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 57 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondents City of New London, Connecticut, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 56 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of City of New York filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 55 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Robert H. Freilich, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 54 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 53 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of California Redevelopment Association filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 52 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 51 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Connecticut filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of American Planning Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Connecticut Conference of Municipalities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Brooklyn United for Innovative Local Development (BUILD), et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Chapter of National Association of Industrial and Office Properties filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of New York State Urban Development Corporation filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Motion of Connecticut for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Record received from Supreme Court of Connecticut. 5 boxes, 15 posterboards, Large maps and 1 sealed envelope)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                CIRCULATED..
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 22, 2005
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Extension of time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits to and including January 21, 2005.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter from amici Pacific Legal Foundation seeking permission to lodge copies of a Nevada Supreme Court decision.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Professor David L. Callies, et al. filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of New London Landmarks, Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Laura B. Kohr and Leon P. Haller filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Cascade Policy Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Better Government Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Reason Foundation filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Develop Don't Destroy (Brooklyn), et al. filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Mary Bugryn Dudko, et al. filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Jane Jacobs filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of John Norquist, President of Congress for New Urbanism filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of King Ranch Inc. filed.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of National Association for Advancement of Colored People, et al. filed.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Tidewater Libertarian Party filed.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of New London R.R. Co., Inc. filed.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief of petitioners Susette Kelo, et al. filed.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Joint appendix filed. ( Jt. Appendix in 3 volumes.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Property Rights Foundation of America, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of K. Hovnanian Companies LLC in support of respondents filed.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Robert Nigel, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of The American Farm Bureau Federation, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of America's Future Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Rutherford Institute filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Extension of time within which to file petitioners' brief on the merits to and including December 3, 2004.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either side received from counsel for the petitioners
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Reply of petitioners Susette Kelo, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Property Rights Foundation of America, Inc.,et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of James M. Buchanan, Gordon Tullock, and Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief of respondents City of New London, Connecticut, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Susette Kelo, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 23, 2004)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 211 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?