Halbert v. Michigan
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-10198

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Antonio Dwayne Halbert, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Wayne State University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Moran +1 313 577 3973 d.moran@wayne.edu
No Logo Toledo, Respondent
Officially listed as "Michigan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bernard Eric Restuccia 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Cox 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by General Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L.M. Casey +1 517 373 1124
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Louisiana, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Schaerr +1 202 282 5845 +1 202 282 5100 gschaerr@winston.com
No Logo National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony J. Franze +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5111 Anthony_Franze@aporter.com
No Logo National Legal Aid and Defender Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elliot H. Scherker +1 305 579 0500 +5790 579 579 0717 scherkere@gtlaw.com
No Logo Wayne County, Michigan, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy A. Baughman +1 313 224 5792
Lower Court Court of Appeals of Michigan
Lower Court Case No(s). 244756
Lower Court Decision Date 1/13/2003
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (07/27/05) of judgment from Clerk, Court of Appeals of Michigan received.
    LREF
    Blank 37 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
    Record returned to Circuit Court, Saginaw County, Michigan.
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
      Record returned to Court of Appeals of Michigan.
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
        MANDATE ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
          Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, O'Connor, Kennedy, Souter, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia, J., joined, and in which Rehnquist, C. J., joined as to all but Part III-B-3.
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
            Motion to file a second supplemental brief after argument filed by petitioner DENIED.
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
              Respondent's opposition to petitioner's second motion to file a supplemental brief after oral argument filed.
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                Motion to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by petitioner GRANTED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 30 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                  Motion to file a second supplemental brief after argument filed by petitioner.
                    LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                    Opposition of respondent to motion of petitioner to file supplemental brief filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 28 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
                      Motion to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by petitioner Antonio Dwayne Halbert.
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                        Argued. For petitioner: David A. Moran, Detroit, Mich. For respondent: Bernard E. Restuccia, Lansing, Mich.; and Gene C. Schaerr, Washington, D.C. (for La., et al., as amici curiae.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                          Motion of Louisiana, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None
                            Reply of petitioner Antonio Dwayne Halbert filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                              Motion of Louisiana, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief of respondent Michigan filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
                                    Record received from the Court of Appeals of Michigan. (1 folder)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                      CIRCULATED.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                        Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including March 24, 2005.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of Wayne County, Michigan filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of National Legal Aid and Defender Association filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, April 25, 2005.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Brief of petitioner Antonio Dwayne Halbert filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Joint appendix filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2005.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Record received from State of Michigan Court of Appeals (one envelope).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Record received from State of Michigan, Circuit Court, County of Saginaw (one envelope)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Record Requested .
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 8, 2004.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief of respondent Michigan in opposition filed. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 13, 2004.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Response Requested . (Due August 16, 2004)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 7, 2004)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 610 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?