United States v. Georgia
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-1203

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo American Association on Mental Retardation, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. +1 505 277 2146
No Logo Georgia, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by General Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E. Langford +1 404 463 8850

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Andrew Castanias +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 gcastanias@jonesday.com
No Logo Tony Goodman, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew S. Days +1 202 887 1500 DDays@mofo.com
No Logo American Academy of Psychiatry and the Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Dick Thornburgh and national Organization on Disability, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Other Party
Officially listed as "Former President George H.W. Bush"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Stephen Hut +1 202 663 6000
No Logo Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles T. Lester, Jr. +8597 859 838 4294 +1 859 486 6590 cteljr@yahoo.com
No Logo National Disability Rights Network, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Behan +1 202 942 5000
No Logo Paralyzed Veterans of America, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried +1 202 469 5151 jerrold.ganzfried@hklaw.com
No Logo Tennessee, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Schaerr +1 202 282 5845 +1 202 282 5100 gschaerr@winston.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-10168-GG
Lower Court Decision Date 9/16/2004
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (02/14/06) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S. District Court for Southern District of Georgia.
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 11th Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 34 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 33 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED Scalia, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. Stevens, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Ginsburg, J., joined.
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner in No. 04-1203: Paul D. Clement, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For petitioner in No. 04-1236: Samuel R. Bagenstos, St. Louis, Mo. For respondents: Gregory A. Castanias, Washington, D.C.; and Gene C. Schaerr, Washington, D.C. (for Tennessee, et al., as amici curiae.)
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioner United States petitioner filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None
                Motion of Tennessee, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                  Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument GRANTED.
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                    Motion of Tennessee, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                      Record received from U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Georgia. (1 box)
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                        Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument filed. VIDED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                          Record received from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Tennessee, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                              CIRCULATED.
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief of respondents Georgia, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Paralyzed Veterans of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Dick Thornburgh and National Organization on Disability filed. VIDED.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Former President George H.W. Bush filed. VIDED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of American Association on Mental Retardation, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of National Disability Rights Network filed. VIDED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of ADAPT, American Academy of Psychiatry and the Law, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of petitioner United States filed. VIDED.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Extension of time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits to and including September 22, 2005 (VIDED).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT on November 9, 2005.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Order extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including July 29, 2005. VIDED.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Petition GRANTED. The case is consolidated with No. 04-1236 and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2005.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2005.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  Reply of petitioner United States filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief of respondents Georgia, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 15, 2005.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Waiver of right of respondent Tony Goodman to respond filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2005)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?