Illinois Tool Works Inc. v. Independent Ink, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-1329

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Illinois Tool Works Inc., et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Joseph Favretto 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Independent Ink, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD F. O'CONNOR

Toggle Switch Represented by Sivas, Deborah Ann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Sullivan +1 650 725 9875
No Logo AARP, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by AARP Foundation Litigation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Anne Jones +1 626 585 2628 +1 626 583 8538 bjones@aarp.org
No Logo American Antitrust Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by & Rubin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Laurence Rubin +1 202 415 0616 +1 877 247 8586 jr@rubinpllc.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Bar Association of the District of Columbia - Patent Trademark & Copyright Section, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dow, Lohnes & Albertson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Long +1 202 776 2071 +1 202 776 4071 glong@dowlohnes.com
No Logo Barry Nalebuff, Ian Ayres, and Lawrence Sullivan, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan I. Horowitz +1 202 626 5839 +1 202 628 0858 ahorowitz@milchev.com
No Logo District of Columbia, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Buffalo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward E. Schwab +1 202 724 5692
No Logo F.M. Scherer, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Parker C. Folse, III +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 pfolse@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Houston Intellection Property Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Houston Intellectual Property Law Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth E. Kuffner +1 832 418 0321
No Logo IAmerican Intellectual Property Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Coyne +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 patrick.coyne@finnegan.com
No Logo Illinois Tool Works Inc., et al. v. Independent Ink, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas G. Hungar +1 202 955 8558 +1 202 530 9555 thungar@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cook Alex McFarron Manzo Cummings & Mehler, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward David Manzo +1 312 236 8500 +1 312 236 8176 emanzo@cookalex.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Owners Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary M. Hoffman +1 703 819 7517 gmhoffmanfl@aol.com
No Logo International Imaging Technology Council, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by International Imaging Technology Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A. Judge +1 702 838 4279
No Logo Motion Picture Association of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "Motion Picture Association of America, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel G. Swanson +1 213 229 7148 +1 213 229 6148 dswanson@gibsondunn.com
No Logo National Association of Theatre Owners and Video Software Dealers Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Interaction Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Mitchell +1 202 415 9213 john@interactionlaw.com
No Logo New York Intellectual Property Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper & Scinto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Francis Ryan +1 212 218 2215
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Other Party
Officer/Director, Arqule, Inc.
Officer/Director, Eclipse Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Icagen, Inc.
Officer/Director, Zoetis Inc.
Officer/Director, Celladon Corp
Officer/Director, Flexion Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mirna Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Rhythm Metabolic, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pfizer Production LLC
Officer/Director, Pfizer Manufacturing LLC
Officer/Director, Allogene Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Icu Medical Inc/de
Officer/Director, Upjohn Inc
Officer/Director, Insite Vision, Inc.
Officer/Director, pSivida LTD
Officer/Director, King Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Officer/Director, Parker Tennessee Corp.
Officer/Director, Cortexyme, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pfizer Ventures (US) LLC
Officer/Director, Imara Inc.
Officer/Director, Bioatla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Stack +1 215 994 4000
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Other Party
Officially listed as "Verizon Communications"

Toggle Switch Represented by Farr & Taranto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Gary Taranto +1 202 775 0184
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Collier, Shannon, Rill & Scott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. MacLeod +1 202 342 8563
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-1196
Lower Court Decision Date 1/25/2005
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.C.A. for Federal Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
    Acknowledgement of receipt (04/04/06) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit received.
      LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Central District of California.
        LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 47 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
          Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Stevens, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which all other Members joined, except Alito, J., who took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
            LREF
            Blank 46 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
            Record received from U.S.D.C. Central Dist. of California. (4 boxes)
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
              Argued. For petitioners: Andrew J. Pincus, Washington, D.C.; and Thomas G. Hungar, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Kathleen M. Sullivan, Redwood Shores, Cal.
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None
                Record received from U.S.C.A. for Federal Circuit. (2 expandable folders)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioners Illinois Tool Works Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None
                    Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                      Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of American Antitrust Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of International Imaging Technology Council, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                              Brief of respondent Independent Ink, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of F.M. Scherer filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Barry Nalebuff, Ian Ayres, and Lawrence Sullivan filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of National Association of Theatre Owners and Video Software Dealers Association filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
                                        Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., et al. GRANTED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
                                          Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including September 28, 2005.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                            CIRCULATED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                              Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Bar Association of the District of Columbia - Patent Trademark & Copyright Section filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Houston Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Verizon Communications filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                Brief of petitioners Illinois Tool Works Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint appendix filed. (Jt appendix in three volumes).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT on November 29, 2005.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Intellectual Property Owners Association GRANTED.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pfizer Inc. GRANTED.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Intellectual Property Law Association GRANTED.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Bar Association GRANTED.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    Supplemental brief of petitioners Illinois Tool Works Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2005.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        Reply of petitioners Illinois Tool Works Inc. and Trident, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2005.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Intellectual Property Owners Association.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pfizer Inc.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Bar Association.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief of respondent Independent Ink, Inc. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Intellectual Property Law Association.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2005)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?