Padilla v. Hanft
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-533

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jose Padilla, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer S Martinez +1 650 725 2749 jmartinez@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Marc Freiman +1 203 498 4584 +1 203 782 2889 jfreiman@wiggin.com
No Logo C. T. Hanft, United States Navy Commander, Consolidated Naval Brig, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burt Neuborne +1 212 998 6730
No Logo Comparative Law Scholars and Experts on Laws of United Kingdom and Israel, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by David N. Rosen & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Rosen +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 drosen@davidrosenlaw.com
No Logo Human Rights First, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence David Rosenberg +1 202 879 7622 +1 202 626 1700 ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
No Logo Janet Reno, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Litt +1 202 942 5398 +9425 942 942 5999 robert.litt@aporter.com
No Logo National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenna, Brenna & Boyce, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald G. Rehkopf +1 585 454 2000 drehkopfjr@brennalaw.com
No Logo Original Congressional Sponsors, John Conyers, Jr., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Stuart Koukoutchos +1 504 626 4409
No Logo Professors of Constitutional Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-6396
Lower Court Decision Date 9/9/2005
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
Petition DENIED Justice Kennedy filed an opinion concurring in the denial of certiorari, in which the Chief Justice and Justice Stevens joined. Justice Ginsburg filed an opinion dissenting from the denial of certiorari. Souter, Ginsburg and Breyer, JJ., would grant the petition. (Detached Opinion)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2006.
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2006.
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2006.
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2006.
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2006.
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 20, 2006.
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2006.
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None
                    Reply of petitioner Jose Padilla filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Professors of Constitutional Law, et al. filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, et al. filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Comparative Law Scholars and Experts on Laws of United Kingdom and Israel filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                              Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights First filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Janet Reno, et al. filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondent C. T. Hanft, United States Navy Commander, Consolidated Naval Brig in opposition filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None
                                      Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Original Congressional Sponsors, John Conyers, Jr., et al. filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                          Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 16, 2005.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2005)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?