Rapanos v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-1034

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John A. Rapanos, et ux., et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Reed Hopper +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 mrh@pacificlegal.org
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Alaska, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Best Best & Krieger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roderick E Walston +1 925 977 3300 +1 925 977 1870 roderick.walston@bbklaw.com
No Logo American Farm Bureau Federation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DJ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES E NUTT +1 561 682 6253 +1 561 682 6276 jnutt@sfwmd.gov
No Logo American Petroleum Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Sayre Llewellyn +1 202 223 0404 +1 202 223 9696 t.llewellyn@att.net
No Logo American Planning Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E. Stroud +1 518 782 4900 +1 518 785 9705 nstroud@nycap.rr.com
No Logo American Rivers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard I. Fox +1 202 363 2765 +1 202 667 2356 hfox@earthjustice.org
No Logo Association of State and Interstate Water Pollution Control Administrators, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Community Rights Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy J. Dowling +1 202 296 6889
No Logo Association of State Wetland Mangers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ENVIRONMENTAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES LAW CLINIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK A. PARENTEAU +1 802 831 1305 pparenteau@vermontlaw.edu
No Logo Attainable Housing Allance, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sebastian Rucci +1 330 707 1182 +1 330 707 1882 SebRucci@Gmail.com
No Logo Calvin H. Johnson, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The University Of Texas School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Calvin Harsha Johnson +1 512 232 1306
No Logo Carol M. Browner, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by STANFORD LAW SCHOOL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Charles Marshall +1 650 723 7572
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CATO Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E. Lynch +1 202 842 0200
No Logo Charles R. Johnson and New England Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by New England Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Malamut +1 617 695 3660
No Logo Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice L. Goldman-Carter +1 952 922 2003
No Logo City of New York, NY, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonard J. Koerner +1 212 356 2500 lkoerner@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Claremont Institute Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Eastman +1 714 628 2587 +1 714 844 4817 jeastman@chapman.edu
No Logo Croplife America, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Edward Schwartz +1 202 624 2905 +1 202 628 5116 rschwartz@crowell.com
No Logo Donald Harkins, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William J. Reisdorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Reisdorf +1 248 689 6996 +1 248 689 6996
No Logo Ducks Unlimited, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Wildlife Federation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. France +1 406 721 6705 +1 406 721 6705 france@nwf.org
No Logo Environmantal Law Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Foundation for Environmental and Economic Progress, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia S. Albrecht +1 202 955 1500 valbrecht@hunton.com
No Logo Home Builders Association of Central Arizona, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fennemore Craig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Pearce +1 602 916 5000 mpearce@fclaw.com
No Logo International Council of Shopping Centers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gus Bloch Bauman +1 202 789 6000
No Logo Jared M. Diamond, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Defenders of Wildlife

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason C Rylander +1 202 772 3245 jrylander@defenders.org
No Logo Jerome B. Carr PhD, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rackemann, Sawyer & Brewster, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian M. Hurley +1 617 951 1129
No Logo John D. Dingell, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Utah

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy J. Wildermuth +1 801 581 6833 amy.wildermuth@law.utah.edu
No Logo John J. Duncan, Jr., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Charles Jackson +1 202 639 7710 +1 202 585 1009 thomas.jackson@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Mackinac Center For Public Policy,, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mackinac Center For Public Policy,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Wright +1 989 631 0900 +1 989 631 0964 wright@mackinac.org
No Logo Mountain States Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Perry Pendley +1 303 292 2021 +1 303 292 1980 wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
No Logo National Association of Home Builders, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Association of Home Builders

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane J. Desiderio +1 202 866 8200
No Logo National Association of Waterfront Employers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CARROLL & FROELICH, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis Edwin Froelich +1 202 587 4802 win@cflaw.us
No Logo National Federation of Independent Business Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R. Gasaway +1 202 879 5000
No Logo National Mitigation Banking Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret N Strand +1 202 344 4699 +1 202 344 8300 mstrand@venable.com
No Logo National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence R. Liebesman +1 202 955 3000 +1 202 955 5564 lliebesman@hklaw.com
No Logo New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin Joan Halligan +1 212 416 8069
No Logo Pulte Homes, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Western Coalition of Arid States, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Briscoe Ivester & Bazel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence S. Bazel +1 415 402 2711 +1 415 398 5630 lbazel@briscoelaw.net
No Logo Western Organization of Resource Councils, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Tebbutt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Tebbutt +1 541 344 8312
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-1489
Lower Court Decision Date 7/26/2004
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 72 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 71 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Aug 1 2006
      LREF
      Blank 70 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jul 21 2006
        LREF
        Blank 69 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Jul 21 2006
          LREF
          Blank 68 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Jul 21 2006
            LREF
            Blank 67 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Jun 19 2006
              LREF
              Blank 66 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Feb 21 2006
                LREF
                Blank 65 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Feb 17 2006
                  LREF
                  Blank 64 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Feb 13 2006
                    LREF
                    Blank 63 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    Jan 18 2006
                      LREF
                      Blank 62 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Jan 13 2006
                        LREF
                        Blank 61 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Jan 13 2006
                          LREF
                          Blank 60 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Jan 13 2006
                            LREF
                            Blank 59 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Jan 13 2006
                              LREF
                              Blank 58 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Jan 13 2006
                                LREF
                                Blank 57 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                Jan 13 2006
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 56 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  Jan 13 2006
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 55 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                    Jan 13 2006
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 54 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                      Jan 13 2006
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 53 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                        Jan 13 2006
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 52 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                          Jan 13 2006
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 51 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                            Jan 13 2006
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 50 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                              Jan 12 2006
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                Jan 12 2006
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                  Jan 12 2006
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                    Jan 6 2006
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                      Dec 29 2005
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                        Dec 16 2005
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                          Dec 9 2005
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                            Dec 2 2005
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                              Dec 2 2005
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                Dec 2 2005
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                  Dec 2 2005
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                    Dec 2 2005
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                      Dec 2 2005
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                        Dec 2 2005
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                          Dec 2 2005
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                            Dec 2 2005
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                              Dec 2 2005
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                Dec 2 2005
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                  Dec 2 2005
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                    Dec 2 2005
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                      Dec 2 2005
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                        Dec 2 2005
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                          Dec 2 2005
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                            Dec 2 2005
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                              Dec 2 2005
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                Dec 2 2005
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Dec 2 2005
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Dec 2 2005
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Dec 2 2005
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Dec 2 2005
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Dec 1 2005
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Nov 29 2005
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Nov 23 2005
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Nov 17 2005
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Nov 17 2005
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    The motion of petitioners to deconsolidate the cases is denied. The motion of petitioners for divided argument is granted to be divided as follows: 20 minutes for petitioners in No. 04-1034; 20 minutes for petitioners in No. 04-1384; 40 minutes for respondents. VIDED.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioners Rapanos. VIDED.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Motion to deconsolidate the cases, or in the alternative, for divided argument filed by petitioners. VIDED.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Petition GRANTED The case is consolidated with No. 04-1384 and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2005.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2005.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Reply of petitioners John A. Rapanos, et ux., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Charles R. Johnson and New England Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 4, 2005.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Jerome B. Carr PhD DENIED.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2005)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 297 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?