Woodford v. Ngo
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-416

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Jeanne S. Woodford, et al., Petitioner

Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer G. Perkell +1 415 703 5726
No Logo Viet Mike Ngo, Respondent

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meir Feder +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 mfeder@jonesday.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Greco +1 312 988 5000
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Represented by One Brookings Drive

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margo Schlanger +1 314 935 8242
No Logo Jeanne S. Woodford, et al. v. Viet Mike Ngo, Other Party

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization of Yale Law School, Other Party

Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Giovanna Shay +1 203 432 4800
No Logo Law Professors, Other Party

Represented by University Of Pennsylvania Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kermit Roosevelt +1 215 746 8775
No Logo New York, et al., Other Party

Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin Joan Halligan +1 212 416 8069
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-16042
Lower Court Decision Date 3/24/2005
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Aug 1 2006
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Aug 1 2006
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Jul 24 2006
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Jun 22 2006
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Mar 22 2006
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Mar 9 2006
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Feb 21 2006
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                  Record received from U.S.D.C. - Northern District of California. (1 envelope)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.C.A. - 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                      CIRCULATED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
                        Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization of Yale Law School filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                                Brief of respondent Viet Mike Ngo filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 22,2006.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief of petitioners Jeanne S. Woodford, et al. filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                          Joint appendix filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                              Petition GRANTED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2005.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Brief of respondent Viet Mike Ngo in opposition filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2005)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 265 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?