Hamdan v. Rumsfeld
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-184

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Salim Ahmed Hamdan, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neal Katyal +1 202 662 9000 katyaln@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo 304 United Kingdom and European Parliamentarians(On Merits) 422 Current and Former Members of United Kingdom and European Union Parliaments, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claude B. Stansbury +1 202 777 4507
No Logo American Center for Law and Justice, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Shapiro +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2651
No Logo American Jewish Committee, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Fisher +1 206 622 3150
No Logo Association of the Bar of the City of New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Benjamin, Jr. +1 212 872 8091 +1 212 872 1002 jbenjamin@akingump.com
No Logo Bar Human Rights Committee of the Bar of England and Wales, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. +1 202 346 4000
No Logo Binyam Mohamed (Torture), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clive A. Stafford +1 504 558 9867
No Logo Brennan Center for Justice, and William N. Eskridge Jr. in support of the petitioner (Presidential Authority Lacking-UCMJ), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher +1 212 373 3238 +1 212 492 0238 srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CATO Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E. Lynch +1 202 842 0200
No Logo Center for National Security Studies, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Certain Former Federal Judges, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul C Saunders +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 psaunders@cravath.com
No Logo Citizens for the Common Defence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Paul Collins +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5125 Daniel.Collins@mto.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo DAVID HICKS, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc A. Goldman +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 mgoldman@jenner.com
No Logo Former Attorneys General of the United States, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew G. McBride +1 202 719 7135 +1 202 719 7049 amcbride@wileyrein.com
No Logo Former Federal Judges Shirley M. Hufstedler and Wiliam A. Norris, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. +1 202 662 9388 rubinp@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo General David Brahms and General James Cullen, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Historians Jack N. Rakove, et al. in support of petitioner, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Susan Karlan +1 650 725 4851 karlan@stanford.edu
No Logo Human Rights First, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanford Crown Quadrangle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah N. Pearlstein +1 650 357 0346
No Logo Human Rights First, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. LoBue +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 rplobue@pbwt.com
No Logo Ibrahim Ahmed Mahmoud Al Qosi (Enforceability on Habeas/Mandamus), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S. Reichler +1 202 223 1200 +1 202 785 6687 preichler@foleyhoag.com
No Logo International Human Rights Organizations for Copnstitutional Rights, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu
No Logo International Law Professors in support of petitioner (Commissions - Geographic Requirement), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Wythe Fdtn. Professor of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda A. Malone +1 757 221 3844
No Logo Law Professors Richard I. Aaron, et al. (Presidential Authority Lacking), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claudia Callaway +1 202 585 6500 +1 202 585 6600 ccallaway@manatt.com
No Logo Lawrence M. Friedman, Jonathan Lurie, and Alfred P. Rubin, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Alderman +1 650 614 7400 +1 415 773 5759 walderman@orrick.com
No Logo Legal Scholars and Historians (Effect of Quirin), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel C. Tepstein
No Logo Louis Fisher, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons, Del Deo, Dolan, Giffinger & Vecchione, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan L. Hafetz +1 212 649 4743

Toggle Switch Represented by onslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence S Lustberg +1 973 596 4500
No Logo Louise Doswald-Beck, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bridget Arimond +1 312 503 8579 b-arimond@law.northwestern.edu
No Logo Madeleine K. Albright and 21 Former Senior U.S. Diplomats, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Hongju Koh +1 203 432 4932 harold.koh@yale.edu
No Logo Military Historians, Scholars and Practitioners, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Teresa Wynn Roseborough +1 404 853 8100 teresa.roseborough@sablaw.com
No Logo More than 300 Detainees Incarcerated at U.S. Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Wilner +1 202 508 8050 +1 202 508 8100 twilner@shearman.com
No Logo National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenna, Brenna & Boyce, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald G. Rehkopf +1 585 454 2000 drehkopfjr@brennalaw.com
No Logo National Institute of Military Justice and Bar Association of the District of Columbia, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
No Logo Norman Dorsen, et al. in support of petitioner (Supreme Court Appellate Jurisdiction), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burt Neuborne +1 212 998 6730
No Logo Office of Chief Defense Counsel, Office of Military Commissions (Abstention Inappropriate), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Autumn West Webster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dwight H. Sullivan +1 202 767 1562 dwight.sullivan@pentagon.af.mil
No Logo Professor Richard D. Rosen, Associate Dean and Director of Center for Military Law and Policy, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven H. Goldblatt +1 202 662 9555
No Logo Professors Goodman, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilbert Randolph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Packman - PHV +1 202 772 2320 +1 202 772 2322 packmanm@gotofirm.com
No Logo Professors Louis Henkin, et al. (Geneva - Enforceability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlos Manuel Vazquez +1 202 662 9447
No Logo Retired Generals and Admirals and Milt Bearden (Geneva Conventions - Judicial Deference)also Arthur R. Miller, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Remes +1 202 669 6508 remesdh@gmail.com
No Logo Richard A. Epstein, et al. (Military Commission Authorized By or Inconsistent With UCMJ), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Martin Panner +1 202 326 7921 +1 202 326 7900 apanner@khhte.com
No Logo Scott L. Fenstermaker, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Thomas Fenstermaker +1 248 318 5444
No Logo Senators Graham and Kyl, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington, D.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Lamken +1 202 639 7978 +1 202 639 7890 jlamken@mololamken.com
No Logo Specialists in Conspiracy and International Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George P. Fletcher +1 212 854 2467
No Logo Urban Morgan Institute for Human Rights in support of petitioner ( theCharming Betsy canon), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Wiltshire Grannis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Wright +1 202 730 1300
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo Yemeni National Organization for Defending Rights and Freedoms, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence David Rosenberg +1 202 879 7622 +1 202 626 1700 ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-5393
Lower Court Decision Date 7/15/2005
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 100 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (08/15/06) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 99 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia.
      LREF
      Blank 98 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S.C.A. for the D.C. Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 97 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 96 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED Stevens,J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I through IV, VI through VI-D-iii, VI-D-v, and VII, in which Kenendy, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined, and an opinion with respect to Parts V and VI-D-iv, in whihc Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Kennedy, Souter, and Ginsburg, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in part, in which Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined as to Parts I and II. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia, J., joined, and in which Alito, J., joined as to all but Parts I, II-C-1, and III-B-2. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined as to Parts I through III. Roberts, C. J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
            LREF
            Blank 95 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Neal Katyal, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Paul D. Clement, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 94 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
              Request for recusal of Justice Scalia received from counsel for amici curiae Retired Generals and Admirals.
                LREF
                Blank 93 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Scott L. Fenstermaker, et al. DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                  LREF
                  Blank 92 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioner Salim Ahmed Hamdan filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 91 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                    Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Scott L. Fenstermaker, et al. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 90 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                      Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 89 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                        Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for the Common Defence filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 88 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law and Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 87 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed).
                              LREF
                              Blank 86 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Senators Graham and Kyl filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 85 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of Former Attorneys General of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 84 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                  Brief of respondents Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 83 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                    Further consideration of respondents' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is deferred to the hearing of the case on the merits. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 82 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                      A total of 90 minutes is allotted for oral argument.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 81 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                        Motion for leave to file surreply regarding respondents' motion to dismiss GRANTED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 80 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Former Federal Judges Shirley M. Hufstedler and William A. Norris GRANTED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 79 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None
                                            Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 78 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None
                                              Motion for leave to file surreply regarding respondents' motion to dismiss filed by petitioner.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 77 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                Respondents' reply brief in support of motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Record received from U.S.D.C. for District of Columbia Circuit. (1 envelope)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Record received from U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit. (1 box)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Petitioner's opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Former Federal Judges Shirley M. Hufstedler and William A. Norris.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                            CIRCULATED.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                              SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 28, 2006.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Motion of petitioner for an order directing the parties to submit supplemental briefing is DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Reply to respondents' opposition to motion for supplemental briefing filed by petitioner. (Distributed).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including February 23, 2006.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        Opposition to petitioner's motion for supplemental briefing filed by respondents.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          Motion of petitioner for supplemental briefing DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 20, 2006.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            Order extending time to file response to motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction to and including January 31, 2006.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by respondents Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion of petitioner for an order directing the parties to submit supplemental briefing filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of David Hicks filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Arthur R. Miller filed. (Abstention and Mandamus).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief of amicus curiae National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Military Commissions - Structure and Procedures)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Professor Richard D. Rosen, Associate Dean and Director of Center for Military Law and Policy, et al. filed. (Issue of Abstention)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of International Human Rights Organizations for Copnstitutional Rights, et al. filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Certain Former Federal Judges filed. (Separation of Powers: Enforceable at Guantanamo)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Human Rights First, et al. filed. (Military Commissions - Torture)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Military Historians, Scholars and Practitioners filed. (Military Commissions and Articles of War)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Madeleine K. Albright and 21 Former Senior U.S. Diplomats filed. (Military Commissions - Independence of Judiciary)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Ibrahim Ahmed Mahmoud Al Qosi filed. (Enforceability on Habeas/Mandamus)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Association of the Bar of the City of New York, et al. filed. (Geneva - Common Art. 3)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of More than 300 Detainees Incarcerated at U.S. Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, et al. filed. (Whether Detainee Treatment Act of 2005 Divests Court of Jurisdiction)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Professors Ryan Goodman, et al. filed. (Geneva - Applicability)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of American Jewish Committee, et al. filed. (Commissions: Rights of Presence and Confrontation)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Bar Human Rights Committee of the Bar of England and Wales, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Liberties Union filed.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Louis Henkin, et al. filed. (Geneva - Enforceability)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Louise Doswald-Beck, et al. filed. (Commissions - Fair Trial Standards)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Louis Fisher filed. (Commissions - History)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Center for National Security Studies, et al. filed. (Effect of Detainee Treatment Act of 2005)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Lawrence M. Friedman, Jonathan Lurie, and Alfred P. Rubin filed.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of National Institute of Military Justice and Bar Association of the District of Columbia filed. (Barbary Wars Precedent)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Requirement of Civilian Jury Trial)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Specialists in Conspiracy and International Law filed. (Conspiracy - Not a Triable Offense)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars and Historians filed. (Effect of Quirin)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Office of Chief Defense Counsel, Office of Military Commissions filed. (Abstention Inappropriate)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Richard I. Aaron, et al. filed. (Presidential Authority Lacking)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        422 Current and Former Members of United Kingdom and European Union Parliaments filed. (International Law - Need for Adherence)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Binyam Mohamed (Torture) filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Yemeni National Organization for Defending Rights and Freedoms filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Retired Generals and Admirals and Milt Bearden (Geneva Conventions - Judicial Deference) filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of General David Brahms and General James Cullen (Congressional Authorization Lacking) filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Richard A. Epstein, et al. (Military Commission Authorized By or Inconsistent With UCMJ) filed.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Brief of petitioner Salim Ahmed Hamdan filed.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Joint appendix filed. (Joint appendix in two volumes).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Brennan Center for Justice, and William N. Eskridge Jr. in support of petitioner (Presidential Authority Lacking-UCMJ) filed.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Norman Dorsen, et al. in support of petitioner (Supreme Court Appellate Jurisdiction) filed.
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Urban Morgan Institute for Human Rights in support of petitioner ( the Charming Betsy canon) filed.
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of International Law Professors in support of petitioner (Commissions - Geographic Requirement) filed.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Historians Jack N. Rakove, et al. in support of petitioner filed.
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including January 6, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Petition GRANTED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 4, 2005.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2005.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 14, 2005.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2005.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Reply of petitioner Salim Ahmed Hamdan filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Association of the Bar of the City of New York filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars and Historians filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Louise Doswald-Beck, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of 304 United Kingdom and European Parliamentarians filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Louis Fisher filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights First filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Retired Generals and Admirals filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Office of Chief Defense Counsel, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Military Justice filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief of respondents Donald H. Rumsfeld, Secretary of Defense, et al in opposition filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2005.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 374 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?