Bennett S. Greenspan v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 05-3302

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Greenspan, Bennett, Petitioner
Officially listed as "Greenspan, Bennett S."

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L. Hess, II
Space Harvey M. Tettlebaum +1 573 635 9118 harvey.tettlebaum@huschblackwell.com
v.
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly B. Blank +1 202 353 7961 +1 202 353 7988 kelly.blank@usdoj.gov
Space Kenneth Michael Dintzer +1 202 307 0340 +1 202 514 8624 kenneth.dintzer2@usdoj.gov
Space Peter D Keisler +1 202 514 3301 +1 202 514 8071 peter.keisler@usdoj.gov
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel C. Rattray +1 314 845 5050 +1 314 845 5057
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
ACTION: MOTION GRANTED.
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
    ACTION: MOTION MOOT.
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
      ACTION: MOTION MOOT.
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION: BY PETITIONER - UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 5/4/2007
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
          MOTION: BY PETITIONER - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY W/REPLY ATTACHED. SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 2/8/2007
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
            REPLY 1: 1/31/2007 ,
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
              MOTION: BY PETITIONER - APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES. SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 1/10/2007
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                MANDATED ON
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                  PETITION ACTION: DENIED ON 12/12/2006.
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                    RESPONDENT [DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ]-PETITION FOR REHEARING. MAIL SERVICE-11/29/2006.
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                      RESPONDENT [DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ]-PETITION FOR REHEARING. MAIL SERVICE-11/21/2006. REJECTED:. NOT FILED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                        SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 1/17/2007 MAILED : 11/22/2006, NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: RESPONDENT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING CANNOT BE FILED (NO TABLE OF CONTENTS, NO ADDENDUM, INCORRECT RESPONDENT NAME/DESIGNATION). A CORRECTED PETITION MAY BE FILED WITHIN 14 CALENDAR DAYS.
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                          ACTION: GRANTED. THE PETITION FOR REHEARING IS DUE ON NOV. 27, 2006.
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                            MOTION: BY RESPONDENT - MOTION FOR AN ADDITIONAL 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A PETITION FOR REHEARING & SUGGESTION FOR REHEARING EN BANC. SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 11/13/2006
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                              ACTION: GRANTED. THE PETITION IS DUE 11/13/06.
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None
                                MOTION: BY RESPONDENT - MOTION FOR A 21-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A PETITION FOR REHEARING & FOR REHEARING EN BANC. SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 10/13/2006
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                  DISPOSITION: REVERSED AND REMANDED ; BY PANEL
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                    ORAL ARGUMENT DATE / CALENDARED
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
                                      APPENDIX OF PETITIONER BENNETT S. GREENSPAN (2 VOLUMES) . BY BENNETT S. GREENSPAN (PETITIONER ). SERVED BY MAIL ON 1/30/2006. FILED ON 1/30/2006 . (NON-CONFIDENTIAL)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
                                        APPENDIX FILING DATE
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                          REPLY BRIEF OF PETITIONER BENNETT S. GREENSPAN . BY BENNETT S. GREENSPAN (PETITIONER ). SERVED BY MAIL ON 1/23/2006. FILED ON 1/23/2006 . (NON-CONFIDENTIAL)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                            APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF FILING DATE
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF FOR RESPONDENT, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS . BY DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (RESPONDENT ). SERVED BY MAIL ON 1/5/2006. FILED ON 1/5/2006 . (NON-CONFIDENTIAL)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                APPELLEE OR CROSS APPELLANT PRINCIPAL BRIEF FILING DATE
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                  ACTION: GRANTED. THE BRIEF IS DUE JANUARY 5, 2006.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION: BY RESPONDENT - RESPONDENT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (28 DAYS). SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 12/5/2005
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                      BRIEF OF PETITIONER BENNETT S. GREENSPAN . BY BENNETT S. GREENSPAN (PETITIONER ). SERVED BY MAIL ON 10/26/2005. FILED ON 10/26/2005 . (NON-CONFIDENTIAL) MAILED : 1/17/2007, CLERK'S LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT REQUESTING A RESPONSE TO THE APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES. THE RESPONSE IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 31 2007.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                        APPELLANT PRINCIPAL BRIEF FILING DATE
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                          SERVICE : BY COURT ON 11/22/2006 RECEIVED: 8/29/2005, PETITIONER'S FEDERAL CIRCUIT RULE 15(C), STATEMENT CONCERNING DISCRIMINATION. SELECTED #1.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                            FILED : 12:00:00 AM SERVICE : BY COURT ON 8/30/2005 FILED : 8/26/2005, CERTIFIED LIST FROM THE MSPB.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                              FILED : 12:00:00 AM SERVICE : BY MAIL ON 8/24/2005 RECEIVED: 8/19/2005, CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST FOR PETITIONER, BENNETT S. GREENSPAN. FILED.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 
                                                                CROSS APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF FILING DATE
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?