Toledo-Flores v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-669

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BP America Production Company, Successor in Interest to Amoco Production Company, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Hunsicker +1 202 639 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington, D.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Lamken +1 202 639 7978 +1 202 639 7890 jlamken@mololamken.com
No Logo Rejane Burton, Acting Assistant Secretary, Land and Minerals Management, Department of the Interior, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo American Petroleum Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Liskow & Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan A Hunter +1 504 581 7979 +1 504 566 4108 jahunter@liskow.com
No Logo Jicarilla Apache Nation,et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NORDHAUS, HALTOM, TAYLOR, TARADASH & BLADH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Elise Grant +1 202 530 1270 +1 202 530 1920 jgrant@nordhauslaw.com
No Logo Mountain States Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Perry Pendley +1 303 292 2021 +1 303 292 1980 wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-5006, 04-5007
Lower Court Decision Date 6/10/2005
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (01/16/07) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
    Record returned to the U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia,
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
      Record returned to the U.S.C.A. for the District of Columbia Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
          Adjudged to be AFFIRMED Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which all other Members joined, except Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, J., who took no part in the consideration or decision of the case. The Chief Justice and Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
            Lodging consisting of requested sample issue letters received from the Solicitor General. (Distributed).
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
              Joint Lodging filed at the request of the Court. (Distributed).
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                Argued. For petitioners: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Daryl Joseffer, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioners BP America Production Company, Successor in Interest to Amoco Production Company, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.D.C. for District of Columbia. (2 boxes)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Jicarilla Apache Nation,et al. filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                        Brief of respondents Rejane Burton, Acting Assistant Secretary, Land and Minerals Management, Department of the Interior, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                          Record received from U.S.C.A. for D.C. Circuit. (1 box)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                            CIRCULATED.
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                              SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 4, 2006.
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including August 4, 2006.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Petroleum Institute filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                      Brief of petitioners BP America Production Company, Successor in Interest to Amoco Production Company, et al. filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                        Joint appendix filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for petitioners.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                            Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits to and including June 13, 2006.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                              Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. The Chief Justice and Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 14, 2006.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Reply of petitioners BP America Production Company, Successor in Interest to Amoco Production Company, et al. filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Jicarilla Apache Nation on statute of limitations question only filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Brief of respondents Rejane Burton, Acting Assistant Secretary, Land and Minerals Management, Department of the Interior, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 13, 2006.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                          Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 27, 2006.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 26, 2006.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2005)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?