MedImmune, Inc. v. Genentech, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-608

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MedImmune, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harvey Kurzweil +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 8204 harvey.kurzweil@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Kester +1 202 434 5000 jkester@wc.com
No Logo City Of Hope National Medical Center, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006
Genentech, Inc. Genentech, Inc., Respondent
Unknown Role, Alteon Inc /de

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen E. Mahoney +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 maureen.mahoney@lw.com
No Logo Genentech, Inc., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Murray Wall +1 415 395 8240 +1 415 395 8095 dan.wall@lw.com
No Logo 3M, General Electric, Proctor & Gamble, and E I.DuPont de Nemours, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by 3M Innovative Properties Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary L Griswold +1 651 733 8904 glgriswold@mmm.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Greco +1 312 988 5000
No Logo American Intellectual Property Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo Boston Patent Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik Paul Belt +1 617 449 6506 ebelt@mccarter.com
No Logo Generic Pharmaceutical Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore C. Whitehouse +1 202 303 1000 +1 202 303 2370 TWhitehouse@willkie.com
No Logo Law of Professors Andrew Beckerman-Rodau, et al, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by hricik.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Charles Hricik +1 478 743 6722 david@hricik.com
No Logo Licensing Executives Society (u.s.a. And Canada), Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine E. Lehman +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 christine.lehman@finnegan.com
No Logo MedImmune, Inc. v. Genentech, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deanne E Maynard +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 dmaynard@mofo.com
Medtronic, Inc. Medtronic, Inc., Other Party
Unknown Role, Antivirals, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cambridge Heart, Inc.
Unknown Role, Tengion, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Carrington Bass, III +1 202 772 8825 +1 202 371 2540 kbass@skgf.com
No Logo Natural Resources Defense Council, Other Party
Officially listed as "Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Lawrence Nelson +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 snelson@citizen.org
No Logo New York Intellectual Property Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper & Scinto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Francis Ryan +1 212 218 2215
No Logo Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Senior Assistant General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marjorie E. Powell +1 202 835 3517
No Logo Professors John R. Allison, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by PROFESSOR OF LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas F. Cotter +1 612 624 7527
No Logo Qualcomm Incorporated and Interdigital Communications Corporation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Rosenkranz +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151 jrosenkranz@orrick.com
No Logo Richard L. Donaldson, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin A. Nelson +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 jnelson@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Three Intellectual Property Professors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodyear Professor of Intellectual Property

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Dratler Jr. +1 330 972 7972
No Logo Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried +1 202 469 5151 jerrold.ganzfried@hklaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Related Case 06A172
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-1300, 04-1384
Lower Court Decision Date 10/18/2005
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Central District of California.
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for Federal Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (02/12/07) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Scalia, J. delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Stevens, Kennedy, Souter, Ginsburg, Breyer, and Alito, JJ., joined. Thomas J., filed a dissenting opinion.
            LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: John G. Kester, Washington, D.C.; and Deanne E. Maynard, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Maureen E. Mahoney, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 42 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
              Record received from U.S.D.C. for the Central District of California. (3 boxes)
                LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioner MedImmune, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                    Application (06A172) denied by The Chief Justice.
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                      Application (06A172) to file petitioner's reply brief on the merits in excess of page limits, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                        LREF
                        Blank 37 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                        Record received from U.S.C.A. for Federal Circuit. (1 box)
                          LREF
                          Blank 36 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed).
                            LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of 3M, General Electric, Proctor & Gamble, and E I.DuPont de Nemours filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Group of Law of Professors, Andrew Beckerman-Rodau, et al filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Professors John R. Allison, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Richard L. Donaldson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Qualcomm Incorporated and Interdigital Communications Corporation filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                            Brief of respondent City of Hope National Medical Center filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Boston Patent Law Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of respondent Genentech, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                      CIRCULATED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 4, 2006.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                          Extension of time within which to file respondents' briefs on the merits to and including July 26, 2006.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Joint appendix filed. Joint appendix in two volumes.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                              Brief of petitioner MedImmune, Inc. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Licensing Executives Society (U.S.A. & Canada), Inc. filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Medtronic, Inc. filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Generic Pharmaceutical Association filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          Further extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including May 17, 2006.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Three Intellectual Property Professors filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Letter from counsel for respondent City of Hope indicating that amicus consent will be addressed on an individual request basis.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                Further extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including May 15, 2006.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the respondent Genentech only.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including May 8, 2006.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        Reply of petitioner MedImmune, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief of respondents Genentech, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 27, 2005.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2005)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?