Gonzales v. Duenas-Alvare
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-1629

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Petitioner
Officially listed as "Alberto R. Gonzales, Attorney General"

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Luis Alexander Duenas-Alvarez, Respondent

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Joseph Meade +1 212 230 8817 +1 212 230 8888 cmeade@wilmer.com
No Logo California Public Defenders Association, Other Party

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Maltby
No Logo National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Other Party

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A. Rothfeld +1 202 263 3000
No Logo Professors of Criminal Law, Other Party

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meir Feder +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 mfeder@jonesday.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-74471
Lower Court Decision Date 4/18/2006
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Record returned to the Department of Justice, Board of Immigration Appeals.
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (02/23/07) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
          Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, Souter, Thomas, Ginsburg, and Alito, JJ., joined, and in which Stevens, J., joined as to Parts I, II, and III-B. Stevens, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part.
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Dan Himmelfarb, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Christopher J. Meade, New York, N.Y.
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
              Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by Professors of Criminal Law GRANTED.
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by California Public Defenders Association GRANTED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioner Alberto R. Gonzales, Attorney General filed. (Distributed). TBP
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                    Brief amicus curiae of National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                      Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Professors of Criminal Law. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                        Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by California Public Defenders Association. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                          Brief of respondent Luis Alexander Duenas-Alvarez filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                            CIRCULATED.
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                              Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                Brief of petitioner Alberto R. Gonzales, Attorney General filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                  Record received from U.S.Department of Justice, Board of Immigration Appeals. (1 envelope).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None
                                    Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner the Solicitor General.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                      Record received from U.S.C.A for the Ninth Circuit. (1 envelope)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, December 5, 2006.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                          The brief of petitioner is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 3 p.m., Thursday, October 26, 2006. The brief of respondent is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 3 p.m., Monday, November 20, 2006. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 3 p.m., Monday, November 27, 2006.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                            Petition GRANTED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                              Reply of petitioner Alberto R. Gonzales, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2006.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of respondent Luis Alexander Duenas-Alvarez in opposition filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2006.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2006)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?