Cunningham v. California
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-6551

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Cunningham, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by PMB 432

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Gold +1 510 872 6305
No Logo CALIFORNIA, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey M. Laurence +1 415 703 1234
No Logo Hawaii, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Inan, Selma M

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly A. Tsumoto +1 808 586 1360
No Logo National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Fisher +1 206 622 3150
Lower Court Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
Lower Court Case No(s). A103501
Lower Court Decision Date 4/18/2005
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Jun 19 2007
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Mar 6 2007
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Feb 23 2007
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Jan 22 2007
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Peter Gold, San Francisco, Cal. (Appointed by this Court.)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
              Letter from counsel for the respondent received. (Distributed).
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioner John Cunningham filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                  Record received from Court of Appeal of California, 1st District, Division 5.
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                    CIRCULATED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                      SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 11, 2006.
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                        Brief of respondent California filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Hawaii, et al. filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                            Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including July 12, 2006.
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                              Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                Brief of petitioner John Cunningham filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                  Joint appendix filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
                                    Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED. Peter Gold, Esquire, of San Francisco, California is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None
                                      Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including May 8, 2006.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None
                                        Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2006.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
                                          Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                            Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                Reply of petitioner John Cunningham filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 22, 2005.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Response Requested . (Due December 8, 2005)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 23, 2005.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 24, 2005)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?