Tellabs, Inc. v. Makor Issues & Rights, Ltd.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 06-484

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tellabs, Inc., et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo Makor Issues & Rights, Ltd., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur R. Miller +1 212 594 5300
Space Richard H Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +8681 868 868 1229 rweiss@milberg.com
No Logo Allan N. Littman and William I. Edlund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartko Zankel Tarrant & Miller, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allan Norman Littman , +1 415 956 1900 +1 415 956 1152 alittman@bztm.com
Amalgamated Bank Amalgamated Bank, Other Party
Officially listed as "Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Long View Collective Investiment Fund, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by Change To Win

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Szymanski +1 202 721 6035
No Logo American Association for Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Robert White +1 202 944 2839 +1 202 965 0902 jeffrey.white@cclfirm.com
No Logo American Institute of Certified Public Accountants, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Arkansas, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo Center for Study of Responsive Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Wiener +1 202 587 5068
No Logo Council of Institutional Investors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Priya R. Aiyar +1 202 326 7000
Space Mark C. Hansen +1 202 326 7904 +1 202 326 7999 mhansen@khhte.com
No Logo German Association for the Protection of Shareholders, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Narwold +1 860 882 1676 +1 860 882 1682 bnarwold@motleyrice.com
No Logo Joseph A. Grundfest, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Richard Cohen +1 202 663 6700 +1 202 663 6363 louis.cohen@wilmerhale.com
No Logo National Conference on Public employee Retirement Systems, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Peter Roddy +1 732 636 8000 +1 732 726 4735 mmcguckin@wilentz.com
No Logo New England Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Warren Roger Stern +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 wrstern@wlrk.com
No Logo New York State Retirement Fund, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Wallace Berger +1 212 554 1403 +1 212 554 1489 MWB@blbglaw.com
No Logo North American Securities Administrators Association inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Senior Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred E. T. +1 202 442 7850
No Logo Ohio and 23 Other States, Territories and Commonwealths, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elise W. Porter +1 614 466 8980
No Logo Pixelplus Co., Ltd. and Quest Software, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Sullivan +1 213 683 6252 +1 213 996 3252 williamsullivan@paulhastings.com
Regents of the University of California Regents of the University of California, Other Party
Officially listed as "Regents of the University of California, et al."
Unknown Role, Owl Rock Capital Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sanford Svetcov +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 sandys@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Securities Industry and Financial Markets Associationand Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Shapiro +1 312 701 7327 +1 312 706 8675 sshapiro@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Technet, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of BRIAN D. BOYLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRIAN D. BOYLE
No Logo Tellabs, Inc., et al. v. Makor Issues & Rights, Ltd., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kannon K. Shanmugam 1 +1 +1 +1
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL L. KICHLINE +1 215 994 4000 + 215 994 2222 michael.kichline@dechert.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-1687
Lower Court Decision Date 1/25/2006
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
    Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Souter, Thomas, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., and Alito, J., filed opinions concurring in the judgment. Stevens, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
      Argued. For petitioners: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D.C.; and Kannon K. Shanmugam, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Arthur R. Miller, Cambridge, Mass.
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
        Letter and attachments received from counsel for the respondents. (Distributed).
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
          Reply of petitioners Tellabs, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
            Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
              Brief amici curiae of New York State Retirement Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                  Brief amicus curiae of Council of Institutional Investors filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of German Association for the Protection of Shareholders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Center for Study of Responsive Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                        Brief of respondents Makor Issues & Rights, Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Ohio and 23 Other States, Territories and Commonwealths filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of National Conference on Public Employee Retirement Systems, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Regents of the University of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Long View Collective Investiment Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Allan N. Littman and William I. Edlund filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                        Record received from U.S.D.C. for Northern District of Illinois. (1 box)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                          Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                            CIRCULATED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                              Brief of petitioners Tellabs, Incorporated and Richard C. Notebaert filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                Joint appendix filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of Pixelplus Co., Ltd. and Quest Software, Inc. filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Technet, et al. filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Joseph A. Grundfest, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of American Institute of Certified Public Accountants, et al. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Associationand Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Record received from U.S.C.A. for 7th Circuit. (1 box)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, March 28, 2007.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Petition GRANTED. The brief of petitioners is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, February 9, 2007. The brief of respondents is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, March 9, 2007. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Tuesday, March 20, 2007.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Reply of petitioners Tellabs, Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief of respondent Makor Issues & Rights, Ltd., et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2006.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2006)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 218 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?