Panetti v. Quarterman
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 06-6407

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Scott Louis Panetti, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith S. Hampton +1 512 476 8484 +1 512 477 3580 hamplaw@swbell.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Defender Service

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory W. Wiercioch +1 512 320 8300 +1 512 477 2153 gwooch@texasdefender.org
No Logo Nathaniel Quarterman, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gena Blount Bunn +1 512 936 1600 +1 512 320 8132 laura.haney@oag.state.tx.us
Space R. Ted Cruz +1 512 936 1824 Ted.Cruz@aog.state.tx.us
Space Tina J. Miranda +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 tina.miranda@oag.state.tx.us
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen J. Mathis +1 215 988 5000
No Logo American Psychological Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Legal Historians, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Neil Weiner +1 202 942 5855 +1 202 942 5999 robert.weiner@aporter.com
No Logo National Alliance for the Mentally IllDivision, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Blume +1 607 255 1030
Type Capital
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-70045
Lower Court Decision Date 5/9/2006
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for the Western District of Texas.
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for the 5th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
        Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia and Alito, JJ., joined.
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioner: Gregory W. Wiercioch, San Francisco, Cal. For respondent: R. Ted Cruz, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
            Supplemental brief of respondent Nathaniel Quarterman, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
              Supplemental brief of petitioner Scott Louis Panetti filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioner Scott Louis Panetti filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                  The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing the following question: Must petitioner's habeas application be dismissed as "second or successive" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2244? The briefs, not to exceed 15 pages, are to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Wednesday, April 11, 2007.
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                    Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                      Brief of respondent Nathaniel Quarterman, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                        Record received from U.S. D.C. for Western District of Texas. (1 box)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                          CIRCULATED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                            Record received from U.S.C.A. for 5th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                              Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED. Keith S. Hampton, Esquire, of Austin, Texas is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                Brief of petitioner Scott Louis Panetti filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                  Joint appendix filed. (Jt. appendix in two volumes. Vol.II oversize.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of Legal Historians filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                              Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including February 22, 2007.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 23, 2007.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, April 18, 2007.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Scott Louis Panetti.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Reply of petitioner Scott Louis Panetti filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Brief of respondent Nathaniel Quarterman, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of National Alliance for the Mentally Ill filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2006.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 12, 2006)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?