Parents Involved in Community Schools v. Seattle School Dist. No. 1
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-908

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Parents Involved in Community Schools, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry J.F. Korrell +1 206 628 7680
No Logo Seattle School District No. 1, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett Bigelow & Leedom, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F Madden +1 206 622 5511 +1 206 622 8986 MMadden@bbllaw.com
No Logo 19 Former Chancellors of the University of California, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Boalt Hall School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Goodwin Liu +1 510 642 7509
No Logo 553 Social Scientists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Liliana M. Garces +1 617 496 1560
No Logo Alliance for Education, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David John Burman +1 206 359 8426 +1 206 359 9426 dburman@perkinscoie.com
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis D. Parker +1 212 549 2500
No Logo American Council on Education, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert E. Toone, Jr. +1 617 832 1242 +1 617 832 7000 rtoone@foleyhoag.com
No Logo American Educational Research Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alexander Community Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo N. Ancheta +1 408 288 3580 aancheta@SCU.EDU
No Logo American Psychological Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Payton +1 202 663 6000
No Logo Anti-defamation League, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Butzel Long, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Edward Karlinsky +1 212 940 8800 +1 212 940 8806 karlinsky@butzel.com
No Logo Asian American Justice Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilbert Randolph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Packman - PHV +1 202 772 2320 +1 202 772 2322 packmanm@gotofirm.com
No Logo Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Wolinsky +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 MWolinsky@wlrk.com
No Logo Asian American Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Litigation Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon M. Fauth, Jr. +1 510 238 9610 +1 510 337 1431 gmf@classlitigation.com
No Logo Association Of The Bar Of The City Of New York, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan I. Blackman +1 212 225 2490 jblackman@cgsh.com
No Logo Black Women Lawyers' Association of Greater Chicago, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Black Women

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon E. Jones 1 +1 +1 +1
No Logo Brennan Center for Justice, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Warrington S. Parker, III +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 wparker@orrick.com
No Logo Caucus for Structual Equity, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Shulman +1 612 632 3335 +1 612 632 4335 daniel.shulman@gpmlaw.com
No Logo Center for Individual Rights, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Individual Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Rosman , +1 202 833 8400 +1 202 833 8410 rosman@cir-usa.org
No Logo Civil Rights Clinic at Howard University Shool of Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aderson Bellegarde Francois +1 202 806 8065 afrancois@law.howard.edu
No Logo Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Scheff & Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George B. Washington +1 313 963 1921
No Logo Collaborative of Catholic Leaders and Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
No Logo Competitive Enterprise Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Competitive Enterprise Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HANS FRANK BADER +1 202 331 2278 +1 202 331 0640 hbader@cei.org
No Logo Council of the Great City Schools, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Council of Great City Schools

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Wright Halbert +1 202 393 2427
No Logo David J. Armor, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Neil Driscoll +1 202 756 3470 +1 202 654 4970 rdriscoll@alston.com
No Logo Florida Governor John Ellis "Jeb" Bush, and State Board of Education, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Woodring +1 850 245 0442
No Logo Former United States Secretaries of Education, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew S. Days +1 202 887 1500 DDays@mofo.com
No Logo Historians, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Greenberg +1 212 854 8030
No Logo Historians of the Civil Rights Era, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
No Logo Hon. Clifford L. Alexander, Jr., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Franklin +1 202 662 0200 +1 202 662 4643 jfranklin@fulbright.com
No Logo Housing Scholars and Research & Advocacy Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. deLeeuw +1 212 859 8726 +1 212 859 4000 michael.deleeuw@friedfrank.com
No Logo Interested Human Rights Clinics and Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia Joy Larsen +1 916 447 9200 +1 916 329 4900 clarsen@orrick.com
No Logo Joseph E. Brann, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Neil Weiner +1 202 942 5855 +1 202 942 5999 robert.weiner@aporter.com
No Logo Latino Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Trasvina
No Logo Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of San Francisco, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Arthur Hirsch +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 sah@kvn.com
No Logo Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Office of the General Counsel, Other Party
Officially listed as "Los Angeles Unified School District"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Wethrell James +1 310 979 8421 +1 310 820 8859 pjames@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Massachusetts, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by General Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Cole +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5762
No Logo Massachusetts Associaton of School Superintendents, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph J. Leghorn +1 617 345 1000 +1 866 947 1719 jleghorn@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Media & Telecommunication Companies, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth G. Taylor +1 202 778 1800
No Logo Mountain States Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Perry Pendley +1 303 292 2021 +1 303 292 1980 wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
No Logo NAACP, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Courtland +1 410 580 5777
No Logo NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore Michael Shaw +1 212 965 2200 +2267 226 226 7592
No Logo National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Keane +1 415 951 1137 +1 415 951 1180 mkeane@dl.com
No Logo National Education Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Education Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Chanin +1 202 822 7035
No Logo National Lawyer's Guild, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Wolfe +1 202 994 3053 zwolfe@gwu.edu
No Logo National Parent Teacher Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Seton Hall University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel Denise Godsil +1 973 642 8957
No Logo National School Boards Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Goldstein +1 202 887 4060 tgoldstein@akingump.com
No Logo National Women's Law Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 310 553 6700 +1 202 383 5414 wdellinger@omm.com
No Logo New York, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin Joan Halligan +1 212 416 8069
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Louise Browne +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 slb@pacificlegal.org
No Logo Parents Involved in Community Schools v. Seattle School District No. 1, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Teddy B. Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Teddy B. Gordon +1 502 585 3534

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Munich +1 404 853 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis J. Mellen +1 502 562 7290
No Logo Professors Amy Stuart Wells, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth D. Heath +1 203 498 4400 +1 203 782 2889 kheath@wiggin.com
No Logo Project on Fair Representation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bert W. Rein +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 brein@wrf.com
No Logo Religious Organizations and Affiliated Individuals, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Rep. Jim Mc"Dermott, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Weissman +1 202 344 4503 +1 202 344 8300 william.weissman@piperrudnick.com
No Logo Senators Edward M. Kennedy, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andy Liu +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 624 2500 aliu@crowell.com
No Logo Swann Fellowship, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita S. Earls +1 919 323 3380 +1 919 323 3942 anita@sourthercoalition.org
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Urban League of Metropolitan Seattle and the National Urban League, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHROETER GOLDMARK & BENDER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca Jane Roe +1 206 622 8000 +1 206 682 2305 roe@sgb-law.com
No Logo Various School Children from Lynn Massachusetts Who are Parties in Comfort v. Lynn School Committee, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for the Preservation of Constitutional Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Williams +1 978 470 1602
No Logo Walt Sherlin, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Harkavy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melinda Lawrence +1 919 829 9490
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 01-35450
Lower Court Decision Date 10/20/2005
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 96 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for the Western District of Washington.
    LREF
    Blank 95 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 94 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
      Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I, II, III-A, and III-C, in which Scalia, Kennedy, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined, and an opinion with respect to Parts III-B and IV, in which Scalia, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment. Stevens, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens, Souter, and Ginsburg, JJ., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 93 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
        Statement of costs for printing received.
          LREF
          Blank 92 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioner: Harry J. F. Korrell, Seattle, Wash.; and Paul D. Clement, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Michael F. Madden, Seattle, Wash.
            LREF
            Blank 91 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
            Letter from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed).
              LREF
              Blank 90 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
              20 copies of affidavit of Kathleen Brose lodged and distributed.
                LREF
                Blank 89 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                Proposed lodging approved by Clerk of Court.
                  LREF
                  Blank 88 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioner Parents Involved in Community Schools filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 87 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                    Motion of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 86 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                      Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 85 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                        Motion of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 84 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of Walt Sherlin filed. (Distributed) VIDED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 83 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Latino Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 82 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 81 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 80 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Former United States Secretaries of Education, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 79 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondents Seattle School District No. 1, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 78 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Interested Human Rights Clinics and Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 77 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of National Lawyers Guild filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 76 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 75 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Brennan Center for Justice, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 74 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Senators Edward M. Kennedy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 73 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of American Educational Research Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of 553 Social Scientists filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Rep. Jim Mc"Dermott, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Housing Scholars and Research & Advocacy Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of NAACP filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of 19 Former Chancellors of the University of California filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Association of the Bar of the City of New York filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Alliance for Education, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Los Angeles Unified School District filed. (Distributed)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Media & Telecommunication Companies filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts Associaton of School Superintendents, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Black Women Lawyers' Association of Greater Chicago, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Collaborative of Catholic Leaders and Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Urban League of Metropolitan Seattle and the National Urban League filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Professors Amy Stuart Wells, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Asian American Justice Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Council of the Great City Schools, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of National Parent Teacher Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Historians of the Civil Rights Era, William Chafe,et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Religious Organizations and Affiliated Individuals filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Historians filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Swann Fellowship, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Joseph E. Brann, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Caucus for Structual Equity filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Hon. Clifford L. Alexander, Jr., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of San Francisco Bay Area filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Civil Rights Clinic at Howard University Shool of Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          U.S.D.C. record received from Chambers of Judge Raymond C. Fisher of the U.S.C.A. for the 9th Circuit.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Record received from U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. (1 box)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CIRCULATED.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, December 4, 2006.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Letter proposing a lodging received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Drs. Murphy, Rossell and Walberg filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Florida Governor John Ellis "Jeb" Bush, and State Board of Education filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of David J. Armor, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Center for Individual Rights filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Various School Children from Lynn Massachusetts Who are Parties in Comfort v. Lynn School Committee filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Brief of petitioner Parents Involved in Community Schools filed.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Joint appendix filed.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Asian American Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Project on Fair Representation, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Extension of time within which to file the respondent's brief on the merits to and including October 10, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including August 21, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from counsel for the respondent consenting to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either/neither party in this case.
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from counsel for the petitioner giving blanket consent for the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either/neither party received.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Petition GRANTED This case is to be argued in tandem with No. 05-915, Meredith v. Jefferson Cty. Bd. of Ed.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply of petitioner Parents Involved in Community Schools filed. (Distributed).
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief of respondents Seattle School District No. 1, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 23, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 492 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?