John R. Sand & Gravel Co. v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 06-1164

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John R. Sand & Gravel Company, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Beier Howlett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey K. Haynes +1 248 645 9400 jhaynes@beierhowlett.com
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Malcolm L. Stewart +1 202 514 2201 malcolm.l.stewart@usjoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Metamora Group, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Goldstein +1 202 887 4060 tgoldstein@akingump.com
No Logo National Association of Home Builders, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Association of Home Builders

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane J. Desiderio +1 202 866 8200
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diana M. Kirchheim +1 425 576 0484
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-5033
Lower Court Decision Date 8/9/2006
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (02/12/08) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
    Record returned to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims.
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
      Record returned to U.S. C.A. for the Federal Circuit.
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
          Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, Souter, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined. Stevens, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg, J., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Jeffrey K. Haynes, Bloomfield Hills, Mich. For respondent: Malcolm L. Stewart, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioner John R. Sand & Gravel Company filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of Metamora Group filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                  Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S. Court of Federal Claims. (2 boxes)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                      CIRCULATED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                        Record received from USCA for Federal Circuit. (1 box containing 1-binder, 1-argument tape and 1 set of pleadings)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                          SET FOR ARGUMENT Monday, November 6, 2007.
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                            The time within which to file the respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 28, 2007.
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                              Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                Brief of petitioner John R. Sand & Gravel Company filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                  Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                      The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 3, 2007.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                        Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                          Reply of petitioner John R. Sand & Gravel Company filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 24, 2007.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                              Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 27, 2007.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2007)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?