Stoneridge Investment Partners, LLC v. Scientific-Atlanta, Inc
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 06-43

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stoneridge Investment Partners, LLC, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
v.
No Logo American Bankers Association, et al, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Rodgin Cohen +1 212 558 3534 cohenhr@sullcrom.com
No Logo AARP, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Wiener +1 202 587 5068
No Logo American Association for Justice, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LOUIS MARTIN BOGRAD +1 202 944 2803 +1 202 965 0920 lou.bograd@cclfirm.com
No Logo American Council of Institutional Investors, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Priya R. Aiyar +1 202 326 7000
No Logo American Institute Of Certified Public Accountants, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Li-Ming Wong 1 +10 +10 1000 Michael.Wong@Ropesgray.com
No Logo American Insurance Association, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN E. MCKEEVER +1 215 656 3310 +1 215 606 3310 johnmckeever@piperrudnick.com
No Logo Arkansas, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo Attorneys' Liability Assurance Society, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John K. Villa +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jvilla@wc.com
No Logo Business Roundtable, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
No Logo California State Teachers Retirement System, Respondent
Unknown Role, hhgregg, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven N. Williams +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 swilliams@cpmlegal.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Douglas Bernstein +1 202 303 1108 +1 202 303 2108 rbernstein@willkie.com
No Logo Change to Win, and CtW Investment Group, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Change To Win

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Szymanski +1 202 721 6035
No Logo Charles W. Adams, and William Von Glahn, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DJ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES E NUTT +1 561 682 6253 +1 561 682 6276 jnutt@sfwmd.gov
No Logo Defense Research Institute, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried +1 202 469 5151 jerrold.ganzfried@hklaw.com
No Logo Former SEC Commissioners Former SEC Commissioners, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur R. Miller +1 212 594 5300
No Logo Former SEC Commissioners and Officials and Law and Finance Professors, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
No Logo James D. Cox, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill E. Fisch +1 215 746 3454 jfisch@law.upenn.edu
No Logo John Conyers, Jr. and Barney Frank, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. Segel +1 202 225 4247
No Logo Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart M. Grant +1 302 622 7000 sgrant@gelaw.com
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Thornburgh +1 717 231 4500
No Logo INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY DEPARTMENT, Respondent
Officially listed as "Motorola"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Sacks +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 stephen.sacks@aporter.com
Motorola, Inc. Motorola, Inc., Respondent
Unknown Role, Broadcast.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Nextel Partners Inc
Unknown Role, Sps Spinco Inc
Unknown Role, Shotspotter, Inc.
Unknown Role, Tut Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Clearwire Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa Cross, Arnold & Porter LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C.. Massaro +1 202 942 5122 +1 202 942 5999 john.massaro@aporter.com
No Logo Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc. and NYSE Euronext, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sivas, Deborah Ann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Sullivan +1 650 725 9875
No Logo National Association of Manufacturers, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Newcombe +1 650 251 5000 +1 650 251 5002 gnewcombe@stblaw.com
No Logo New York State Teachers' Retirement System, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Wallace Berger +1 212 554 1403 +1 212 554 1489 MWB@blbglaw.com
No Logo North American Securities Administrators Association, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Senior Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred E. T. +1 202 442 7850
No Logo Ohio, Texas, and 30 other States and Commonwealths, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elise W. Porter +1 614 466 8980
No Logo Organization for International Investment, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart Jay Baskin +1 212 848 4000 +1 646 848 4974 sbaskin@shearman.com
Regents of the University of California Regents of the University of California, Respondent
Officially listed as "Regents of the University of California, et al."
Unknown Role, Owl Rock Capital Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Regents of University of California, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
No Logo Richard I. Beattie, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
No Logo Scientific Atlanta, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan E. Hurd +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 253 8268 shurd@alston.com
Space Oscar N. Persons +1 404 881 7249 oscar.persons@alston.com
No Logo Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., and Motorola, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Shapiro +1 312 701 7327 +1 312 706 8675 sshapiro@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and Futures Industry Association, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 310 553 6700 +1 202 383 5414 wdellinger@omm.com
No Logo Stoneridge Investment Partners, LLC v. Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas G. Hungar +1 202 955 8558 +1 202 530 9555 thungar@gibsondunn.com
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepperdine University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth W. Starr +1 213 680 8400 +1 202 654 9545 ken.starr@pepperdine.edu
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-1974
Lower Court Decision Date 4/11/2006
  Entries (140) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 140 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 139 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Mar 5 2008
      LREF
      Blank 138 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Mar 5 2008
        LREF
        Blank 137 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Mar 5 2008
          LREF
          Blank 136 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Feb 19 2008
            LREF
            Blank 135 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Jan 15 2008
              LREF
              Blank 134 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Oct 9 2007
                LREF
                Blank 133 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Sep 25 2007
                  LREF
                  Blank 132 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Sep 20 2007
                    LREF
                    Blank 131 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    Sep 19 2007
                      LREF
                      Blank 130 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Sep 19 2007
                        LREF
                        Blank 129 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Aug 31 2007
                          LREF
                          Blank 128 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Aug 24 2007
                            LREF
                            Blank 127 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Aug 20 2007
                              LREF
                              Blank 126 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Former SEC Commissioners
                                LREF
                                Blank 125 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 124 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 123 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 122 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 121 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 120 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 119 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 118 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 117 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 111 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 102 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Aug 20 2007
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Aug 16 2007
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Aug 15 2007
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Defense Research Institute filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Record received from U.S.C.A. for 8th Circuit. (1 box) U.S.D.C. for Eastern District of Missouri record is electronically filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Commissioners and Officials and Law and Finance Professors filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SET FOR ARGUMENT Tuesday, October 9, 2007.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to file amici brief by John Conyers, Jr. and Barney Frank out of time filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Opposition of respondents to motion of Former SEC Commissioners to file an amici curiae brief out of time.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                .
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The time to within which to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 15, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of California State Teachers' Retirement System filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief of petitioner Stoneridge Investment Partners, LLC filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Ohio, Texas, and 30 other States and Commonwealths filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Regents of University of California filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Charles W. Adams, and William Von Glahn filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Change to Win, and CtW Investment Group filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of New York State Teachers' Retirement System, et al.filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of American Council of Institutional Investors filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of James D. Cox, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either/neither party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The time for filing the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 11, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Petition GRANTED. The Chief Justice and Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 23, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 16, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply of petitioner Stoneridge Investment Partners, LLC filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief of respondent Motorola in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief of respondent Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response Requested . (Due October 20, 2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2006.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Waiver of right of respondent Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. to respond filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Waiver of right of respondent Motorola, Inc. to respond filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental brief of petitioner filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 223 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?