District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit United States Supreme Court

ConnectU LLC v. Zuckerberg, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 07-1796

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Last Updated September 28, 2017 at 12:54 AM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Winklevoss, Cameron Howard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cameron Winklevoss"
No Logo Divya Narendra, Defendant
No Logo Tyler Winklevoss, Defendant
No Logo ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Giunta +1 617 502 8206
Space Michael P. Giunta +1 617 502 8206
Space Kevin G. Kenneally +1 617 502 8220 +1 617 502 8270
Space Kevin G. Kenneally +1 617 502 8220 +1 617 502 8270

Toggle Switch Represented by #40948-018

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN LEE RICHES
No Logo Andrew Mccollum, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY BECKMAN
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
Space J. Peter Coll +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151
Space Donald Daybell +1 650 614 7400
Space G. Hopkins Guy +1 650 614 7400
Space Robert D. Nagel +1 650 614 7400
Space Theresa Ann Sutton +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 jakandjon@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeremy P. Oczek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy P. Oczek

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by PATENT ADMINISTRATOR PATENT DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Christopher Hughes, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY BECKMAN
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
Space J. Peter Coll +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151
Space Donald Daybell +1 650 614 7400
Space G. Hopkins Guy +1 650 614 7400
Space Robert D. Nagel +1 650 614 7400
Space Theresa Ann Sutton +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 jakandjon@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeremy P. Oczek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy P. Oczek

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by PATENT ADMINISTRATOR PATENT DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Dustin Moskovitz, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY BECKMAN
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
Space J. Peter Coll +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151
Space Donald Daybell +1 650 614 7400
Space G. Hopkins Guy +1 650 614 7400
Space Robert D. Nagel +1 650 614 7400
Space Theresa Ann Sutton +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 jakandjon@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeremy P. Oczek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy P. Oczek

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by PATENT ADMINISTRATOR PATENT DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Eduardo Saverin, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Daybell +1 650 614 7400
Space G. Hopkins Guy +1 650 614 7400
Space Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com
Space Gordon P. Katz +1 617 573 5839 +1 617 523 6850
Space Robert D. Nagel +1 650 614 7400
Space Theresa Ann Sutton +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 jakandjon@yahoo.com
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY BECKMAN
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
Space J. Peter Coll +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151
Space Donald Daybell +1 650 614 7400
Space G. Hopkins Guy +1 650 614 7400
Space Robert D. Nagel +1 650 614 7400
Space Theresa Ann Sutton +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 jakandjon@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeremy P. Oczek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy P. Oczek

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by PATENT ADMINISTRATOR PATENT DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY BECKMAN
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
Space J. Peter Coll +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151
Space Donald Daybell +1 650 614 7400
Space G. Hopkins Guy +1 650 614 7400
Space Robert D. Nagel +1 650 614 7400
Space Theresa Ann Sutton +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 jakandjon@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeremy P. Oczek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy P. Oczek

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by PATENT ADMINISTRATOR PATENT DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Connectu LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth W. Curtis
Space John F. Hornick
Space Daniel P. Kaufman +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400
Space Scott McConchie +1 617 796 8920
Space MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD
Space Daniel Patrick Tighe +1 617 542 9900 +1 617 542 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrett & Dunner, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet
Nature of Suit 4190 - Contract: Other
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=04-11923&caseId=04-11923
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=04-11923&caseId=04-11923
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Archives location information: Transfer Number PT276-10-0039. Box Number 117/261.
The Court of Appeals record is held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. Copies of the record can be ordered online at http://www.archives.gov/northeast/boston/public/court-records.html. [07-1796] (BS)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Record returned to originating court:. Three black binders of exhibits [07-1796] (CC)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00101179179 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER entered by Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge denying motion to intervene and request to appear as amicus filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. [07-1796] (MH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION filed by pro se Jonathan Lee Riches for rehearing en banc, to intervene, and to file amicus curiae brief. Certificate of service was not included. [07-1796] (MH)
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Record returned to originating court:. Docs. 1-46, 47-50, 52-55, 57-64, 65, 66, 68-71, 73-79, 81-85, 86, 88-98, 101-120, 121-128, 131-140, 143-150, 153, 154-177, 178-186, 188-193, 195, 196, 198-200, 208-218, 222-248, 250-260, 264-268, 269-277, 279-281, 283-291, 292-301, exhibits 10, 13, 13-A, 14-16, 18, 19-A, 21, 22, 26-31, 34, 37, A-D, E, G, R, V, 50-2, exhibit list, transcripts 219-221, 261-263, sealed docs. 38(exhibit20), 51(exhibit 26), 99(exhibits3, 6-9), 100, 101(exhibit 8), 142(exhibit6-9), 148(exhibits3, 4, 6, 8, 9, 13, 18, 20, 21), 158(exhibit l), 182(exhibit 4, 7, 9-22), 187(2), 197(exhibits A,H), 199(exhibits A-Q), 202(exhibit 1), 207(E,F), 226(exhibits F, K, Q, S, T, U, W, X), 278( exhibits A-E,) 282, exhibit C, [07-1796] (CC)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0010124468 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MANDATE Issued. [07-1796] (MH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 001021294 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ERRATA sheet to opinion (published) filed. [07-1796] (SBT)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 0010451 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                JUDGMENT entered by Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Senior Appellate Judge and Eugene E. Siler, Appellate Judge. 07-1796 Remanded [07-1796] (MH)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 0010450 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  OPINION issued by Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Senior Appellate Judge and Eugene E. Siler, Appellate Judge. Published. [07-1796] (MH)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CASE ARGUED 1/9/08. Case argued. Panel: Lipez Appellate Judge, Selya Senior Appellate Judge, Siler Appellate Judge. [07-1796] (KT)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      PUBLIC NOTE: Appellees notice of intent to argue previously filed motion to dismiss. [07-1796] (MH)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Designation form filed. Attorney Daniel K. Hampton for Appellee Eduardo Saverin will be presenting oral argument. (KT)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Designation form filed. Attorney John F. Hornick for Appellant ConnectU LLC will be presenting oral argument. (KT)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Designation form filed. Attorney I. Neel Chatterjee for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Appellee Christopher Hughes, Appellee Andrew McCollum, Appellee Dustin Moskovitz, Appellee Mark Zuckerberg will be presenting oral argument. (KT)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Case calendared: 01/09/2008 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom.. [07-1796] (KT)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT reply brief filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. [07-1796] (MH)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. Length: 31 pages/6,914 words, Copies: 9, Served by mail. Certificate of service date 11/26/07. [1312835-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER entered by Chief Judge Michael Boudin. The motion to dismiss the appeal as moot is denied without prejudice to its reconsideration by the panel that decides the appeal on the merits. The mootness argument seems highly doubtful, and the availability and merit of the alternative "standing" argument are sufficiently uncertain that there is no reason to address these issues now. [07-1796] (SP)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ORDER entered. Appellees Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Christopher Hughes, and The Facebook, Inc. has filed a notice indicating their intent to join in the brief of Appellee Eduardo Saverin. The decision to adopt a co-party's brief is the litigant's decision, see Fed. R. App. P. 28(i), and the litigant must bear whatever risks that course of action entails, including that the court will deem the argument not transferable or waived. See United States v. Casas, 425 F.3d 23, 30 n.2 (1st Cir. 2005); United States v. David, 940 F.2d 722, 737 (1st Cir. 1991); United States v. Zannino, 895 F.2d 1, 17 (1st Cir. 1990). [07-1796] (MH)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER entered. Appellee Andrew McCollum has filed a notice indicating his intent to join in the brief of Appellee Eduardo Saverin. The decision to adopt a co-party's brief is the litigant's decision, see Fed. R. App. P. 28(i), and the litigant must bear whatever risks that course of action entails, including that the court will deem the argument not transferable or waived. See United States v. Casas, 425 F.3d 23, 30 n.2 (1st Cir. 2005); United States v. David, 940 F.2d 722, 737 (1st Cir. 1991); United States v. Zannino, 895 F.2d 1, 17 (1st Cir. 1990). (MH)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          PUBLIC NOTE: Joinder of appellees Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Christopher Hughes, and The Facebook, Inc. [07-1796] (MH)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            PUBLIC NOTE: Joinder of appellee Andrew McCollum. [07-1796] (MH)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              BRIEF filed by Appellee Eduardo Saverin. Length: 35 pages (7,497 words), Copies: 11, Served by mail. Certificate of service date 11/7/07. [1306538-1] Reply brief due 11/26/07. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Eduardo Saverin filed. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT Appellee's disk filed by Appellee Eduardo Saverin. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Andrew McCollum filed. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CD-Rom Brief submitted by Appellee Andrew McCollum. (RL)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        BRIEF filed by Appellee Andrew McCollum. Length: 40 pages (9,625 words), Copies: 10, Served by mail. Certificate of service date 11/5/07. [1306297-1] [07-1796] (RL)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CD-Rom Brief submitted by Appellee Mark Zuckerberg, Appellee Dustin Moskovitz, Appellee Christopher Hughes, Appellee Facebook, Inc.. (RL)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT Appellee's Brief filed on cd-rom by Appellee Andrew McCollum. [07-1796] (CD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              BRIEF filed by Appellee Mark Zuckerberg, Appellee Dustin Moskovitz, Appellee Christopher Hughes, Appellee Facebook, Inc.. Length: 43 pages (10,106 words), Copies: 10, Served by mail. Certificate of service date 11/5/07. [1306293-1] [07-1796] (RL)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ORDER entered. Upon consideration of motion of appellee, It is ordered that the time for Eduardo Saverin to file his brief be enlarged to and including November 7, 2007. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Mark Zuckerberg, Appellee Dustin Moskovitz, Appellee Andrew McCollum, Appellee Christopher Hughes, Appellee Facebook, Inc. filed. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION filed by Appellee Eduardo Saverin to extend time to file Appellee's brief until 11/7/07. Ext. Code: OTH Certificate of service dated 11/5/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Appellees' REPLY in support of motion to dismiss appeal as moot. Certificate of service dated 10/12/07. [1297954-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER entered. Defendants-Appellees' assented-to motion for extension of time to file brief to November 5, 2007 is granted. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION filed by Appellees to extend time to file Appellee's brief until 11/5/07. Ext. Code: OTH Certificate of service dated 10/5/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Opposition filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC to motion dismiss appeal as moot. [1289179-1] Certificate of service dated 10/1/07. [1294850-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. Copies: 5. Volumes: 3. Delivered by mail. Certificate of service date 9/19/07 [VOLUMES FILED UNDER SEAL][1289975-1] [07-1796] (RL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPENDIX filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. Copies: 5. Volumes: 8. Delivered by mail. Certificate of service date 9/19/07 [1289974-1] [07-1796] (RL)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ConnectU LLC filed. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CD-Rom Brief submitted by Appellant ConnectU LLC. (RL)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      BRIEF filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. Length: 32 pages (7,635 words), Copies: 10, Served by mail. Certificate of service date 9/19/07. [1289971-1] Appellee brief due 10/22/07. [07-1796] (RL)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION filed by Appellees' to dismiss appeal as moot. [1289179-1] Certificate of service dated 9/17/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Appellees' opposition to ConnectU LLC's motion to defer briefing, or in the alternative, for dismissal without prejudice to re-file. [1283600-1] Certificate of service dated 9/17/07. [1289177-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by John F. Hornick for Appellant ConnectU LLC. [1285792-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION to defer briefing, or in the alternative, for dismissal without prejudice to refile filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. [1283600-1] Certificate of service dated 8/31/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Daniel P. Kaufman for Appellant ConnectU LLC. [1278308-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Meredith H. Schoenfeld for Appellant ConnectU LLC. [1278301-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Appellant's Brief due 9/19/07. Appendix due 9/19/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER entered by Judge Juan R. Torruella. Defendants-appellees Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, and Christopher Hughes have filed a "Motion to Amend Caption" seeking to "correct the named defendants by changing 'Facebook, Inc.' to 'TheFaceBook.com a/k/a TheFaceBook.'" They explain that "the original Complaint, the dismissal of which gave rise to the present appeal," names "TheFaceBook.com a/k/a TheFaceBook" as a defendant. The motion is untimely because, as the defendants-appellees have conceded, it was not filed within seven days of service of the docketing statement. See 1st Cir. Loc. R. 3.0(a)(3). And in any event, it appears that changing "Facebook, Inc." to "TheFaceBook.com a/k/a TheFaceBook" would be misleading. After all, on October 28, 2004, ConnectU filed an Amended Complaint (docket # 13) replacing "Facebook.com a/k/a The Facebook" with "TheFacebook, Inc." See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). And, beginning with its Answer to the Amended Complaint on November 18, 2004 (docket # 14), the defendants-appellees captioned the case with either "TheFacebook, Inc." or "Facebook, Inc." as a defendant. For these reasons, the "Motion to Amend Caption" is DENIED without prejudice to later reconsideration by the panel that will be deciding the merits of the appeal. So ordered. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by G. Hopkins Guy for Appellees Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1265776-1] [07-1796] (AS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Theresa A. Sutton for Appellees Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1265772-1] [07-1796] (AS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ATTORNEYS G. Hopkins Guy, III and Theresa A. Sutton for Appellees Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, [07-1796] (AS)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              REPLY to Appellant's Opposition to Appellees' Motion to Amend Caption filed by Appellees Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes and Facebook, Inc. [1259631-1]. Certificate of service dated 6/27/07. [1262081-1] [07-1796] (SP)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                COUNTER-DESIGNATION of additional portions of the record to be included in the record appendix filed by Appellees. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER entered. Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file the designation of the record appendix to June 25, 2007 is granted. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC to motion to amend caption. [1258642-1] Certificate of service dated 6/20/07. [1259631-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ConnectU LLC filed. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by Defendants to extend time to file appendix. Certificate of service dated 6/19/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION filed by Appellees to amend caption. Certificate of service dated 6/15/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Facebook, Inc. filed. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ORDER entered. The joint motion for an extension of time within which to file the parties' briefs is denied as moot, given that a briefing schedule has not yet been set. [07-1796] (SP)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC and Appellees Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes and Facebook, Inc. to extend time to file Appellant's brief until 8/20/07. Certificate of service dated 6/13/07. [07-1796] (SP)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Gordon P. Katz for Appellee Eduardo Saverin. [1255559-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION of contents of appendix and statement of issues filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Amy Beckman for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1254940-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by J. Peter Coll for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1254936-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by I. Neel Chatterjee for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1254934-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Monte Cooper for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1254928-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Jeremy P. Oczek for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1254924-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Steven M. Bauer for Appellee Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, and Mark Zuckerberg. [1254918-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Annette Hurst for Appellee Eduardo Saverin. [1254894-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Daniel K. Hampton for Appellee Eduardo Saverin. [1254886-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Transcript Report/Order Form filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. Transcript of already on file. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Scott McConchie for Appellant ConnectU LLC. [1252809-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Daniel Patrick Tighe for Appellant ConnectU LLC. [1252808-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Involvement of attorney Gordon P. Katz terminated. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Involvement of attorney Troy Grabow for ConnectU LLC terminated. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Involvement of attorney Lawrence R. Robins for ConnectU LLC terminated. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Involvement of attorney Jonathan M. Gelchinsky for ConnectU LLC terminated. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD filed: consisting of docket entries 1-71, 73-86, 88-128, 131-150, 153-281, 283-301 & 3 binders of exhibits. [1250711-1] [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL CASE docketed. Opening forms sent. Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant ConnectU LLC. Appearance form due 6/5/07. Docketing Statement due 6/5/07. Transcript Report/Order due 6/5/07. [07-1796] (MH)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 443 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?