Baze v. Rees
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-5439

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ralph Baze and Thomas C. Bowling, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Beaton Verrilli +1 213 683 9507 +1 202 639 6066
No Logo Ralph Baze, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Kentucky Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Barron +1 502 564 3948 david.barron@ky.gov
No Logo John D. Rees, Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Corrections, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Kentucky Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Cummings +1 502 564 3620 john.cummings@ky.gov
Space Jeffrey T. Middendorf +1 502 564 3279 jeff.middendorf@ky.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy T. Englert, Jr. +1 202 775 4503 +1 202 775 4510 renglert@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewin & Lewin, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan Lewin +1 202 828 1000 +8280 828 828 0909 nat@lewinlewin.com
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Holdridge +1 919 682 5659
No Logo American Society of Anesthesiologists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE J. FOX +1 215 988 2714 +1 215 988 2757 foxlj@dbr.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Critical Care Providers and Clinical Ethicists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
No Logo Drs. Kevin Concannon, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Simona Gurevich Strauss +1 650 251 5000 +1 650 251 5002 sstrauss@stblaw.com
No Logo Fordham University School of Law, Louis Stein Center for Law and Ethics, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fordham University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alison J. Nathan +1 212 636 7692
No Logo Human Rights Watch, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Michael Morales, Michael Taylor, Vernon Evans, Jr., and John Gary Hardwick, Jr., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Death Penalty Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ty Alper +1 510 643 7849
No Logo Ralph Baze and Thomas C. Bowling v. John D. Rees, Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Corrections, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory G. Garre +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Texas, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Ted Cruz +1 512 936 1824 Ted.Cruz@aog.state.tx.us
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Anesthesia Awareness Campaign, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Wyner +1 202 828 2000 rwyner@goodwinprocter.com
Type Capital
Lower Court Supreme Court of Kentucky
Lower Court Case No(s). 2005-SC-0543
Lower Court Decision Date 11/22/2006
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
Record returned to Franklin County Kentucky Circuit Court.
    LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
    Record returned to the Supreme Court of Kentucky.
      LREF
      Blank 47 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
      MANDATE ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
        Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Roberts, C.J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered an opinion, in which Kennedy and Alito, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a concurring opinion. Stevens, J., filed an opinion councurring in the judgment. Scalia, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Thomas, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Scalia, J., joined. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Ginsubrg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Souter, J., joined.
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
          Letter of respondent John D. Rees, Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
            Redacted Version of Joint appendix Volume IV filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
              Argued. For petitioners: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Washington, D.C. For respondents: Roy T. Englert, Jr., Washington, D.C.; and Gregory G. Garre, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
                LREF
                Blank 42 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 41 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                  Reply of petitioners Ralph Baze, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 40 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                    Lodging proposal of respondents approved by Clerk of Court.
                      LREF
                      Blank 39 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                      Letter from counsel for respondents received.
                        LREF
                        Blank 38 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                        Record received from Franklin County Kentucky Circuit Court. (2 boxes)
                          LREF
                          Blank 37 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                          Record received from Supreme Court of Kentucky. (1 box)
                            LREF
                            Blank 36 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 35 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                              Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 34 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                Motion for leave to file Volume IV of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 33 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                  Letter of opposition to respondents' lodging proposal received from counsel for petitioners.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                        Letter of proposal to LODGE copies of a transcript from Dr. Dershwitz' trial deposition in Harbison v. Little, received from counsel for respondents.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 29 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                          Reply of petitioners to response to motion to file volume IV of the joint appendix under seal filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                            Response to motion of petitioner to file volume IV of the joint appendix under seal filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                              Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 7, 2007.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                Brief of respondents John D. Rees, Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Response to motion of petitioner to file volume IV of the joint appendix under seal requested. (Response to motion due December 3, 2007)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Received from counsel 1 Large binder containing printed transcripts.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                      CIRCULATED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, January 7, 2008.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of American Society of Anesthesiologists in Support of Neither Party filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of Drs. Kevin Concannon, et al. filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Fordham University School of Law, Louis Stein Center for Law and Ethics filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights Watch filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Michael Morales, Michael Taylor, Vernon Evans, Jr., and John Gary Hardwick, Jr. filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Anesthesia Awareness Campaign, Inc. in Support of Neither Party filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Critical Care Providers and Clinical Ethicists filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint appendix filed, Volumes 1 - III. (Statement of costs received)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief of petitioners Ralph Baze, et al. filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion for leave to file Volume IV of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioners Ralph Baze, et al.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    The order granting the petition for a writ of certiorari is amended as follows: The motion of petitioners for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted limited to Questions 1, 2, and 3 presented by the petition. The brief of petitioners is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Monday, November 5, 2007. The brief of respondents is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Monday, December 3, 2007. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, December 28, 2007. Briefs of amici curiae are to be filed with the Clerk and served upon counsel for the parties on or before 2 p.m., 7 days after the brief for the party supported is filed, or if in support of neither party, within 7 days after the petitioners' brief is filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. The brief of petitioners is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Monday, November 5, 2007. The brief of respondents is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Monday, December 3, 2007. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, December 28, 2007. Briefs of amici curiae are to be filed with the Clerk and served upon counsel for the parties on or before 2 p.m., 7 days after the brief for the party supported is filed, or if in support of neither party, within 7 days after the petitioner's brief is filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        Supplemental brief of petitioners Ralph Baze, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          Supplemental reply brief of petitioners Ralph Baze, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2007.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              Reply of petitioners Ralph Baze, et al. filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief of respondents John D. Rees, Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2007)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 535 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?