Exxon Shipping Co. v. Baker
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-219

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Exxon Shipping Company, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 310 553 6700 +1 202 383 5414 wdellinger@omm.com
No Logo Grant Baker, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Oesting +1 907 257 5300 +1 907 257 5399 daveoesting@dwt.com
No Logo Alaska, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com
No Logo Alaska Legislative Council, on behalf of Alaska State Legislature and Former Alaska Governors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter Margulies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared A. Goldstein +1 401 254 4594 jgoldstein@rwu.edu
No Logo American Association for Justice, and Public Justice PC, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Robert White +1 202 944 2839 +1 202 965 0902 jeffrey.white@cclfirm.com
No Logo American Commercial Lines, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by One US Bank Plaza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond L. Massey +1 314 552 6075
No Logo American Institute of Marine Underwriters, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Thacher, Proffitt & Wood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph G. +1 212 912 7400
No Logo American Maritime Safety Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Seham Seham Meltz and Petersen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee R.A. Seham +1 914 997 1346 +1 914 997 7125 ssmpls@aol.com
No Logo American Petroleum Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Frey +1 212 506 2500 +1 212 262 1910 afrey@mayerbrown.com
No Logo American Waterways Operators, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Shubert & Barer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara L. Holland +1 206 464 3939 +1464012 +14 464 0125 bholland@gsblaw.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo Experts on Alcohol in the Workplace, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vanya S. Hogen +1 612 766 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Assistance to Minnesota Prisoners

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colette Routel +1 651 290 6327 colette.routel@wmitchell.edu
No Logo Former Ship Masters and Expert Mariners, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S Edelman +1 212 973 3471 +1 212 972 9432 Pedelman@kreindler.com
No Logo International Association of Drilling Contractors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Arthur Jackson +1 713 224 8380
No Logo International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Jonathan Benner +1 202 274 2950
No Logo International Chamber of Shipping, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chester D Hooper +1 212 513 3445 +1 212 385 9010 chester.hooper@hklaw.com
No Logo Jean-Michel Cousteau and Other Natural Scientists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerson Harry Smoger +1 510 531 4529 +1 510 531 4377 jessica@texasinjurylaw.com
No Logo Keystone Shipping Co., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Knapp McConomy Merle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Elisa Reeves +1 610 827 2044
No Logo Maritime Law Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Coleman +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 gcoleman@yettercoleman.com
No Logo Maryland and 33 Other States, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M Sullivan +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6955 ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
No Logo National Congress of American Indians, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Landye Bennett Blumstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Case +1 907 276 5152 +1 907 276 8433 dcase@lbblawyers.com
No Logo National Fisheries Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by John R Hillsman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Hillsman +1 415 421 9292 uroy3@aol.com
No Logo Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Utah

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy J. Wildermuth +1 801 581 6833 amy.wildermuth@law.utah.edu
No Logo Prince William Sound Regional Citizens' Advisory Council, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Alan Wendt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Walker +1 907 278 7000 +1 907 278 7001 bill-wwa@ak.net
No Logo Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg & Kennedy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Malcolm E. Wheeler +1 303 244 1800
No Logo Professor Arthur Miller, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo Professor Thomas J. Schoenbaum, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Schoenbaum +20222 229 944 0391 tschoen@law.gwu.edu
No Logo Professors David J. Bederman, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Jones +1 505 823 2015 abutaza@gmail.com
No Logo Sociologists, Psychologists, and Law and Economics Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Howe & Russell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Howe +1 301 941 1913 ahowe@ghrfirm.com
No Logo Transportation Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark I. Levy +1 202 824 1437 mlevy@kilpatrickstockton.com
No Logo Trustees for Alaska, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Environmental Law and Policy Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard A Learner +1 312 673 6500 +1 312 795 3730 hlearner@elpc.org
No Logo U.S. Senators Theodore F. Stevens, and Lisa Murkowski, and U.S. Reprensentative Don Young, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Senator

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore F. Stevens +1 202 224 3004
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Popeo +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Related Case 07A575
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-35183
Lower Court Decision Date 12/22/2006
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
    LREF
    Blank 74 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
    Reply concerning respondents' submission with respect to Rule 42.1 received.
      LREF
      Blank 73 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
      Response to Respondents' submission with respect to Rule 42.1 received.
        LREF
        Blank 72 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
        Respondents' submission with respect to Rule 42.1 received.
          LREF
          Blank 71 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None
          Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Souter, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kenendy, and Thomas, JJ., joined, and in which Stevens, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined, as to Parts I, II, and III. Scalia, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Thomas, J., joined. Stevens, J., Ginsburg, J., and Breyer, J., filed opinions concurring in part and dissenting in part. Alito, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
            LREF
            Blank 70 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioners: Walter Dellinger, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. Justice Alito recused.
              LREF
              Blank 69 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
              18 copies of Video Compilation No. 9 (at JA 1295) submitted by counsel for respondents.
                LREF
                Blank 68 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioners Exxon Shipping Company, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 67 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                  Motion of Alaska for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                    LREF
                    Blank 66 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                    Motion for additional time to argue by respondent GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                      LREF
                      Blank 65 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                      Letter, dated February 11,2008, from counsel for respondents received. (Distributed).
                        LREF
                        Blank 64 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                        Application (07A657) granted by Justice Kennedy of petitioners for leave to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit. provided that the brief does not exceed 9,000 words.
                          LREF
                          Blank 63 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                          Reply letter of Alaska in support of motion for divided argument filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 62 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                            Letter, dated February 6, 2008, received from counsel for petitioner.
                              LREF
                              Blank 61 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                              Petitioners' opposition to motion of Alaska for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument.
                                LREF
                                Blank 60 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                Application (07A657) of petitioners for leave to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 59 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Experts on Alcohol in the Workplace filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                    Motion for additional time to argue filed by respondents Grant Baker, et al.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 57 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Former Ship Masters and Expert Mariners, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 56 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Alaska filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 55 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice, and Public Justice PC filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 53 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Maryland and 33 Other States filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 52 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of National Fisheries Institute filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of Sociologists, Psychologists, and Law and Economics Scholars filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Jean-Michel Cousteau and Other Natural Scientists filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Professor Arthur Miller filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of National Congress of American Indians, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Motion of Alaska for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Professor Thomas J. Schoenbaum filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of Prince William Sound Regional Citizens' Advisory Council, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Trustees for Alaska, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Theodore F. Stevens, and Lisa Murkowski, and U.S. Reprensentative Don Young filed. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Record received from U.S.D.C. for the District of Alaska. (1 envelope)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      22 copies of a DVD containing Respondents' Submission of Select Trial Exhibits received from counsel for the respondents.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief of respondents Grant Baker, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Alaska Legislative Council, on behalf of Alaska State Legislature, and Former Alaska Governors filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            CIRCULATED.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Application (07A575) of respondents for leave to file the brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation granted by Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Record received from U.S.C.A. for the 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Application (07A575) of respondents for leave to file the brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Maritime Safety Inc. filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of American Petroleum Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of International Chamber of Shipping, et al. filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Transportation Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, February 27, 2008.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief of petitioners Exxon Shipping Company, et al. filed.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Supplemental joint appendix filed (2 volumes). (Statement of costs received).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint appendix filed (4 volumes). (Statement of costs received).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioners.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either or neither party received from counsel for the respondents.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              The time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 22, 2008.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 17, 2007.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1, 2, and 3(1) presented by the petition. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Reply of petitioners Exxon Shipping Company, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 26, 2007.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Professors David J. Bederman, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Maritime Law Association filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief of respondents Grant Baker, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of International Chamber of Shipping, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Transportation Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Drilling Contractors filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of American Commercial Lines Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Keystone Shipping Co. filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Institute of Marine Underwriters filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of American Petroleum Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of American Waterways Operators, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioners.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2007)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 350 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?