Oregon v. Ice
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-901

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Oregon, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary H. Williams +1 503 378 4402
No Logo Thomas Eugene Ice, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Public Defense Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Gartlan +1 503 378 3349

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ernest G. Lannet +1 503 378 3349 Ernest.G.Lannet@opds.state.or.us
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Indiana, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Indiana Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Fisher +1 317 232 6255 +1 317 232 7979 tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
No Logo National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T. Green +1 202 736 8291 +1 202 736 8711 jgreen@sidley.com
No Logo Sentencing Law Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan F. Mitchell +1 703 314 9276 +1 617 748 3960 jfmitchell@mac.com
Lower Court Supreme Court of Oregon
Lower Court Case No(s). S52248
Lower Court Decision Date 10/11/2007
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
Mandate Issued
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
    Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Kennedy, Breyer, and Alito, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Souter and Thomas, JJ., joined.
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
      Argued. For petitioner: Mary H. Williams, Solicitor General, Salem, Ore. For respondent: Ernest G. Lannet, Senior Deputy Public Defender, Salem, Ore. (Appointed by this Court.)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
        Reply of petitioner Oregon filed. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
          Record received from the Supreme Court of Oregon. (1 box)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
            Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
              Brief of respondent Thomas Eugene Ice filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                CIRCULATED
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                  The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 1, 2008.
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in suport of either party or neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                      SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, October 14, 2008.
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                        Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Sentencing Law Scholars filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                              Brief of petitioner Oregon filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                  Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent GRANTED. Ernest G. Lannet, Esquire, of Salem, Oregon, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent in this case.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                    The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 2, 2008.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                      Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 8, 2008.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                        Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Thomas Eugene Ice.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                          Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the Sixth Amendment, as construed in Apprendi v. New Jersey, 530 U.S. 466 (2000), and Blakely v. Washington, 542 U.S. 296 (2004), requires that facts (other than prior convictions) necessary to imposing consecutive sentences be found by the jury or admitted by the defendant.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                            Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 14, 2008.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                Reply of petitioner Oregon filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Thomas Eugene Ice.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Brief of respondent Thomas Eugene Ice in opposition filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2008)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Space Space

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?